Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Elliott Pinkney, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by John Mark Hundhausen, against Dave Kumar Roy Esq, Personal Representative Of The Estate Of Dave K Roy, Roy & Associates Pa, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with Janis Brustares Keyser presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
CategoryLegal Malpractice |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
This complaint is filed by Elliott Pinkney against defendants Roy & Associates, P.A. and Dave Kumar Roy, Esq. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of the defendants in handling legal services for the plaintiff's battery claim, negligence clai...
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 17, 2021CLERK'S DEFAULT
Date: July 28, 2021SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: July 02, 2021SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: July 02, 2021NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: December 21, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: April 13, 2022ORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Date: February 14, 2022PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4431156
Date: April 19, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: June 17, 2021PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4072743
Date: June 21, 2021ORDER SETTING HEARING
Date: February 04, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: June 17, 2021NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED
Date: July 28, 2021MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: July 23, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: April 19, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: June 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4431156 $10.00 4431156 Fully Paid |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED johnmark@1800askdave.com;service@1800askdave.com AS TO DFT JAYSON E MATHURIN AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF DAVE KUMAR ROY ESQ |
|
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT AMENDED. F/B PLT |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER KEYSER DTD 3/9/22: PLT'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE ESATE AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE CLAIM AGAINST THE ESTATE GRANTED KEYSER DTD 3/9/22: PLT'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE ESATE AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE CLAIM AGAINST THE ESTATE GRANTED |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND DESIGNATION OF THIS CASE TO THE GENERAL TRACK JUDGE J KEYSER SIGNED 2-14-2022 |
|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING J KEYSER: 2-24-22 AT 1:45PM VIA ZOOM ON MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE ESTATE DTD 2-4-22 |
|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE ESTATE UPON SUGGESTION OF DEATH AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE CLAIM AGAINST THE ESTATE MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE ESTATE UPON SUGGESTION OF DEATH AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE CLAIM AGAINST THE ESTATE |
|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S DEFAULT DAVID@DISMUKELAW.COM;JOHNMARK@DISMUKELAW.COM;FRONDESK@DISMUKELAW.COM AGAINST ROY & ASSOCIATES, P.A. |
|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED DAVID@DISMUKELAW.COM;JOHNMARK@DISMUKELAW.COM; FRONTDESK@DISMUKELAW.COM AGAINST DAVE KUMAR ROY, ESQ NEED MILITARY STATUS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.