Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mark Black, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by Garcia M Isidro, against School Board Of Palm Beach County, represented by Andrew Carrabis, Jean Marie Middleton, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with Bradley G. Harper presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryDiscrimination Employmnt/Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
This complaint is filed by Mark Black against the School Board of Palm Beach County for violations of his rights under the Florida Public Sector Whistleblower Act. Mark Black was employed as a Maintenance Technician II and was terminated after engagi...
MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: October 25, 2021NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: November 29, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: June 09, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL
Date: July 13, 2021NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: July 13, 2021NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: July 13, 2021PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4068768
Date: June 16, 2021NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: October 22, 2021ORDER SETTING HEARING
Date: August 24, 2021ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 10, 2022MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: March 25, 2022DCM WITH JURY TRIAL ORDER
Date: February 16, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL
Date: July 13, 2021RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: January 10, 2022MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: March 02, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 09, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: February 17, 2022ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: February 23, 2022RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: March 02, 2022RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: January 18, 2022NOTICE DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG
Date: January 10, 2022RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: April 26, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 28, 2022NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: December 16, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: December 16, 2021ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: December 06, 2021ORDER HARPER: ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS. DENIED DTD 11-16-21
Date: November 16, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: November 29, 2021MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: July 07, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: June 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DEFENDANT'S RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF MARK BLACK 05/02/2022 10:00:00 AM |
|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF HEARING 06/07/2022 08:30:00 AM |
|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL BETTER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION AND FOR SANCTIONS |
|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REOUEST FOR PRODUCTION AND FOR SANCTIONS |
|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES PLAINTIFF'S ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S, FIRST SET OF INTERRQGATDRIES |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF MARK BLACK 04/28/2022 10:00:00 AM |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
DCM WITH JURY TRIAL ORDER JUDGE HARPER DTD 2/16/22 |
|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DEFENDANT, THE SCHOOL BOARD OF PALM BEACH COUNTY'S NOTICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF, MARK BLACK DEFENDANT, THE SCHOOL BOARD OF PALM BEACH COUNTY'S NOTICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF, MARK BLACK |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.