Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Evanston Insurance Company, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Michael F Wallace, Stephen Barker, against Cintas Corporate Services Inc, Cintas Corporation, Cintas Corporation No 2, Lifeline Fire Protection Inc, Signature Flight Support Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Ryan D Burns, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with PAIGE GILLMAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 04, 2021 |
CategoryBusiness Tort |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
This complaint is filed by Evanston Insurance Company on behalf of Boca Aircraft Maintenance, LLC against Signature Flight Support, LLC, Cintas Corporation, Cintas Corporation No. 2, Cintas Corporate Services, Inc., and Lifeline Fire Protection, Inc....
12/01/2021
Date: May 01, 204508/05/2021
Date: May 01, 204012/22/2021
Date: May 01, 204706/02/2021
Date: May 01, 203605/12/2021
Date: May 01, 203310/20/2021
Date: May 01, 204312/01/2021
Date: May 01, 204410/06/2021
Date: May 01, 204103/04/2021
Date: May 04, 202403/26/2021
Date: May 18, 202403/26/2021
Date: May 19, 202403/30/2021
Date: May 20, 202403/04/2021
Date: May 07, 202403/04/2021
Date: May 10, 202403/04/2021
Date: May 09, 202403/04/2021
Date: May 06, 202403/26/2021
Date: May 17, 202403/04/2021
Date: May 03, 202403/04/2021
Date: May 02, 202404/01/2021
Date: May 21, 202403/04/2021
Date: May 11, 202403/12/2021
Date: May 13, 202403/12/2021
Date: May 14, 202403/04/2021
Date: May 08, 202403/04/2021
Date: May 05, 202404/13/2021
Date: May 25, 202404/12/2021
Date: May 24, 202404/14/2021
Date: May 26, 202404/13/2021
Date: May 23, 202404/12/2021
Date: May 22, 202405/12/2021
Date: May 31, 202405/19/2021
Date: May 01, 203403/09/2021
Date: May 12, 202403/12/2021
Date: May 15, 202410/16/2021
Date: May 01, 204212/22/2021
Date: May 01, 204601/04/2022
Date: May 01, 204803/15/2021
Date: May 16, 202405/19/2021
Date: May 01, 203505/03/2021
Date: May 28, 202405/02/2021
Date: May 27, 202405/05/2021
Date: May 29, 202407/15/2021
Date: May 01, 203708/05/2021
Date: May 01, 203805/12/2021
Date: May 01, 203208/05/2021
Date: May 01, 2039COMPLAINT
Date: March 04, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: March 04, 2021EXHIBIT
Date: March 04, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 04, 2021SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: March 12, 2021SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: March 15, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: March 04, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: March 04, 2021SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED
Date: March 26, 2021ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: March 26, 2021SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: March 12, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: March 04, 2021SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: March 12, 2021PAID $451.00 ON RECEIPT 3938412
Date: March 09, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: March 04, 2021PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 3963981
Date: March 26, 2021ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: April 12, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: April 13, 2021THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: April 12, 2021CLERK'S DEFAULT
Date: May 05, 2021PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 3987025
Date: April 14, 2021REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: May 03, 2021MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: May 02, 2021EXHIBIT
Date: May 12, 2021EXHIBIT
Date: May 19, 2021EXHIBIT
Date: May 12, 2021MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: May 19, 2021VERIFIED MOTION
Date: October 16, 2021NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY
Date: October 06, 2021ORDER SETTING HEARING
Date: December 01, 2021PAID $100.00 ON RECEIPT 4219712
Date: October 20, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: December 22, 2021ORDER RESETTING
Date: January 04, 2022NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: February 15, 202205/05/2021
Date: May 30, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2048 | Docket Event | ORDER RESETTING | |
May 01, 2047 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER GILLMAN: GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO ADMIT MICHAEL WALLACE ESQUIRE PRO HAC VICE DTD 12-22-21 | |
May 01, 2046 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
May 01, 2045 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING | |
May 01, 2044 | Docket Event | ORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (IF NOT AGREED BUT ORDERED BY COURT) | |
May 01, 2043 | Docket Event | PAID $100.00 ON RECEIPT 4219712 | |
May 01, 2042 | Docket Event | VERIFIED MOTION | |
May 01, 2041 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY | |
May 01, 2040 | Docket Event | REPLY/RESPONSE | |
May 01, 2039 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.