Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Allegiant Capital Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Jessica F Watts, against Assured Storm Protection Llc, Debbie Oshatz, Marc Oshatz, Tenant #1, Tenant #2, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with Joseph Marx presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2021 |
CategoryHr Foreclosure > $50K, < $250K |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is a verified mortgage foreclosure complaint filed by Allegiant Capital, LLC against multiple defendants in the Circuit Court of the Fifteenth Judicial Circuit in Palm Beach County, Florida. The plaintiff alleges that the defendants, i...
08/19/2021
Date: January 16, 203608/23/2021
Date: January 16, 2040CLERK NOTICE NOT CONFIDENTIAL
Date: August 20, 2021CLERK'S DEFAULT
Date: April 01, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: February 03, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: February 03, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: February 03, 2021NOTICE OF FILING
Date: August 19, 2021STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: February 03, 2021MOTION MOTION TO CANCEL SEPTEMBER 29,2021, NON-JURY TRIAL
Date: August 23, 2021NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING
Date: February 03, 2021MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 19, 2021NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY
Date: March 30, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: February 03, 2021SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED
Date: February 24, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 19, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: February 03, 2021LIS PENDENS BOOK 32172 PAGE 1417-1418
Date: February 03, 2021NOTICE OF FILING
Date: February 03, 2021SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED
Date: February 24, 2021DOR FORECLOSURE FORM
Date: September 17, 2021ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 32919 PAGE 1746-1747
Date: September 28, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: August 19, 2021SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED
Date: February 24, 2021NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT
Date: March 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 17, 2021MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: March 30, 2021NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING
Date: August 19, 2021SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: February 24, 2021PAID $993.60 ON RECEIPT 3899027
Date: February 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 19, 2021ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL
Date: July 26, 2021SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: February 24, 2021SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED
Date: February 24, 2021SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: February 24, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: August 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 19, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: February 03, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: February 03, 2021CLERK NOTICE NOT CONFIDENTIAL
Date: February 05, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: February 03, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: February 03, 202104/01/2021
Date: January 27, 202409/01/2021
Date: January 16, 204608/19/2021
Date: January 16, 203508/19/2021
Date: January 16, 203408/31/2021
Date: January 16, 204408/19/2021
Date: January 16, 203309/17/2021
Date: January 16, 204809/28/2021
Date: January 16, 205008/23/2021
Date: January 16, 204108/23/2021
Date: January 16, 204208/20/2021
Date: January 16, 203909/17/2021
Date: January 16, 204709/01/2021
Date: January 16, 204508/27/2021
Date: January 16, 204309/24/2021
Date: January 16, 204909/28/2021
Date: January 16, 205208/19/2021
Date: January 31, 202408/19/2021
Date: January 30, 202407/26/2021
Date: January 29, 202407/26/2021
Date: January 28, 202403/30/2021
Date: January 26, 202403/30/2021
Date: January 25, 202403/30/2021
Date: January 24, 202402/24/2021
Date: January 23, 202402/24/2021
Date: January 22, 202402/24/2021
Date: January 21, 202402/24/2021
Date: January 20, 202402/24/2021
Date: January 19, 202402/24/2021
Date: January 18, 202402/24/2021
Date: January 17, 202402/05/2021
Date: January 16, 202402/05/2021
Date: January 15, 202402/03/2021
Date: January 11, 202402/03/2021
Date: January 12, 202402/03/2021
Date: January 13, 202402/03/2021
Date: January 14, 202402/03/2021
Date: January 06, 202402/03/2021
Date: January 08, 202402/03/2021
Date: January 10, 202402/03/2021
Date: January 09, 202402/03/2021
Date: January 07, 202402/03/2021
Date: January 04, 202402/03/2021
Date: January 02, 202402/03/2021
Date: January 03, 202402/03/2021
Date: January 05, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2052 | Docket Event | NOTICE NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CANCEL SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 29, 2021, DISMISS CAUSE OFACTION, AND RETURN ORIGINAL COLLATERAL TO PLAINTIFF | |
January 16, 2051 | Docket Event | DISPOSED BY DEFAULT | |
January 16, 2050 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 32919 PAGE 1746-1747 | |
January 16, 2049 | Docket Event | MOTION MOTION TO CANCEL SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 29, 2021, DISMISS CAUSE OF ACTION, AND RETURN ORIGINAL COLLATERAL TO PLAINTFF | |
January 16, 2048 | Docket Event | DOR FORECLOSURE FORM | |
January 16, 2047 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
January 16, 2046 | Docket Event | NOTICE NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CANCEL SEPTEMBER 29, 2021, NON-JURY TRIAL | |
January 16, 2045 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MARX; PLTF'S MOTION TO CANCEL 9/29/2021 NON JURY TRIAL IS GRANTED; NON JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 9/29/2021 IS CANCELLED AS A SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING IS SCHEDULED FOR 9AM ON 9/29/2021 DTD 9/1/2021 | |
January 16, 2044 | Docket Event | NOTICE NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT INCLUDINGA HEARING TO TAX ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS TO BE HEARD VIA ZOOM | |
January 16, 2043 | Docket Event | ORDER J MARX DTD. 8/27/21 GRANTING PLTFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT INCLUDING A HEARING TO TAX ATTYS FEES AND COSTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.