Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Song, Bora, against Crespin, Anthony W, represented by In Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with SEXTON, ANDREA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 05, 2021 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ====NOT ENTERED AS REQUESTED====REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PREVIOUSLY ENTERED ON 9/24/02021 BORA SONG (Attorney) on behalf of DISCOVER BANK (PLAINTIFF) |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION . ENTERED AS REQUESTED. BORA SONG (Attorney) on behalf of DISCOVER BANK (PLAINTIFF) | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE OF SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; NOTICE OF INCLUSION IN DELAY REDUCTION PROGRAM AND NOTICE OF CMC; ADR PACKET; STATEMENT OF VENUE AS TO ANTHONY W CRESPIN ATTEMPTED ON 4/18/2021 - BY FAX BORA SONG (Attorney) on behalf of DISCOVER BANK (PLAINTIFF) | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: FIRST CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 10/27/2021 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA Location: DEPT 3 Result: VACATED
Judge: SEXTON, ANDREA |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET - BY FAX | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF: STATEMENT OF VENUE - BY FAX |
|
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INCLUSION IN DELAY REDUCTION | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT DEMAND UNDER $10K - BY FAX Receipt: 263581 Date: 04/06/2021 | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED & FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.