Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Suzette Grace Rodriguez, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against David Aaronberg, Krista Marx, Micheal Vann Goodwin, Thomas Ceccarelli, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with G. Joseph Curley presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategoryOther Professional Malpractice |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
EMERGENCY MOTION
Date: August 25, 2021AUTOMATIC RECEIPT APPELLATE FILING
Date: September 23, 2021ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 32913 PAGE 174-176
Date: September 24, 2021TRUE COPY
Date: September 23, 2021TRUE COPY
Date: September 23, 2021TRUE COPY
Date: October 05, 2021APPEALS - REQUEST FOR FILING FEE
Date: September 23, 2021EXHIBIT
Date: September 20, 2021INVOICE
Date: November 08, 2021TRUE COPY
Date: November 01, 2021COPY
Date: December 02, 2021APPL AND AFF OF INDIGENCY
Date: August 25, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT
Date: September 07, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL CIVIL BOOK 32904 PAGE 1080-1082
Date: September 22, 2021TRUE COPY
Date: December 13, 2021EMERGENCY MOTION
Date: September 15, 2021AUTOMATIC RECEIPT APPELLATE FILING
Date: December 23, 2021TRUE COPY
Date: December 16, 2021INVOICE
Date: October 28, 2021AUTOMATIC RECEIPT APPELLATE FILING
Date: December 02, 2021TRUE COPY
Date: January 10, 2022INDEX TO RECORD ON APPEAL
Date: October 28, 2021TRUE COPY
Date: February 09, 2022ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NEW CASE
Date: September 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
TRUE COPY 4DCA ORDER APPELLANT’S 1/11/22 “MOTION REQUEST RECUSAL OF SITTING JUSTICE ON APPEAL & APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL” IS DENIED. APPEAL DISMISSED |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
TRUE COPY 4DCA ORDER APPELLANT’S 12/15/21 “MOTION STATUS OF PAYMENT FOR RECORD ON APPEAL” IS HELD IN ABEYANCE |
|
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
AUTOMATIC RECEIPT APPELLATE FILING CLERK'S RESPONSE TO MTC (4DCA) |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
TRUE COPY 4DCA ORDER CLERK OF THE LOWER TRIBUNAL IS DIRECTED TO REPLY, W/IN 5 DAYS TO APPELLANT’S 12/15/21 RESPONSE. IN THE ALTERNATIVE, THE CLERK OF THE LOWER TRIBUNAL MAY TRANSMIT THE RECORD. |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
TRUE COPY 4DCA ORDER APPELLANT SHALL FILE A REPORT, W/IN 5 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, AS TO THE STATUS OF THE PAYMENT FOR THE ROA |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
COPY OF NOTICE OF INABILITY TO TRANSMIT RECORD ON APPEAL |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
AUTOMATIC RECEIPT APPELLATE FILING OF NOTICE OF INABILITY TO TRANSMIT RECORD ON APPEAL |
|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
INVOICE 2ND INVO |
|
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
TRUE COPY 4DCA ORDER APPELLANT’S 10/6/21 MOTION TO CORRECT THE RECORD IS DENIED; 10/20/21 “REQUEST FOR ORDER OF RECUSAL” IS DENIED |
|
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
INVOICE ROA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.