Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Arca 21 Llc, Arca Group International Ltd, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Aliette D Rodz, against Hpi Plumbing Inc, represented by Robert O Dugan, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with Howard K. Coates, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 08, 2020 |
CategoryContract & Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is filed by ARCA GROUP INTERNATIONAL, LTD. and ARCA 21 LLC against HPI PLUMBING, INC. The plaintiffs allege breach of contract and negligence in excess of $30,000. The plaintiffs are a British Virgin Islands company and a Florida limit...
06/22/2021
Date: January 16, 2034REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: December 07, 2020PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3773901
Date: October 09, 2020NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: December 07, 2020SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: October 27, 2020NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY
Date: December 04, 2020ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 05, 2021ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 19, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY
Date: February 03, 2021CERTIFICATE
Date: December 22, 2020REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: January 28, 2021RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION
Date: February 09, 2021NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: June 22, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION
Date: May 19, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: May 19, 2021NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: February 25, 2021MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: May 12, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION
Date: August 19, 2021AGREED ORDER APPROVING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE JUDGE 12/14/21
Date: December 14, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: April 13, 2021AMENDED NOTICE TAKING DEPO
Date: May 20, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: July 22, 2021ORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Date: December 09, 2021RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: July 13, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: December 09, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: December 23, 2020CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: October 08, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: October 08, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL
Date: November 20, 2020NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: December 18, 2020RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: January 19, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: January 08, 2021ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: November 30, 2020MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: January 06, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: May 13, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: October 08, 2020CERTIFICATE
Date: February 18, 2021RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: April 05, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: March 02, 202105/20/2021
Date: January 16, 203305/12/2021
Date: January 29, 202404/13/2021
Date: January 28, 202404/05/2021
Date: January 27, 202401/19/2021
Date: January 18, 202401/07/2021
Date: January 16, 202412/09/2021
Date: January 16, 204112/14/2021
Date: January 16, 204212/09/2021
Date: January 16, 203908/19/2021
Date: January 16, 203807/22/2021
Date: January 16, 203607/26/2021
Date: January 16, 203707/13/2021
Date: January 16, 203505/19/2021
Date: January 16, 203205/19/2021
Date: January 31, 202405/13/2021
Date: January 30, 202402/25/2021
Date: January 24, 202404/05/2021
Date: January 26, 202403/02/2021
Date: January 25, 202401/19/2021
Date: January 19, 202402/09/2021
Date: January 22, 202401/28/2021
Date: January 20, 202402/18/2021
Date: January 23, 202402/03/2021
Date: January 21, 202401/08/2021
Date: January 17, 202401/06/2021
Date: January 15, 202411/30/2020
Date: January 08, 202412/07/2020
Date: January 09, 202410/27/2020
Date: January 06, 202412/23/2020
Date: January 14, 202412/04/2020
Date: January 11, 202412/07/2020
Date: January 10, 202412/22/2020
Date: January 13, 202412/18/2020
Date: January 12, 202411/20/2020
Date: January 07, 202410/08/2020
Date: January 02, 202410/08/2020
Date: January 01, 202410/09/2020
Date: January 05, 202410/08/2020
Date: January 03, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2042 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER APPROVING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE JUDGE 12/14/21 | |
January 16, 2041 | Docket Event | ORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |
January 16, 2040 | Docket Event | DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER | |
January 16, 2039 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
January 16, 2038 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION | |
January 16, 2037 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER COATES; ON PLTF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; ARCA'S MOTION IS GRANTED; SHALL SERVE ITS RESPONSES AND/OR OBJECTIONS TO DFT HPO PLUMBING INC'S SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES ON OR BEFORE 8/5/2021 DTD 7/26/2021 | |
January 16, 2036 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | |
January 16, 2035 | Docket Event | RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
January 16, 2034 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS | |
January 16, 2033 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE TAKING DEPO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.