Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Kristen N Radcliffe, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Charles Wiggins, against Admirals Bank, Andrew D Haverstick, First Federal Bank Of Florida, Pennymac Loan Services Llc, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, (total of 5) See All represented by Amanda Driscole, Lauren Bluestein, Shaib Y Rios, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with Joseph Marx presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2020 |
CategoryOther Rp Actions = > $250K |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
09/30/2021
Date: January 27, 202411/09/2021
Date: January 16, 2035NOTICE OF FILING
Date: October 20, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL
Date: November 20, 2020STATEMENT
Date: September 30, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: November 05, 2021CORRESPONDENCE
Date: March 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 10, 2021MOTION MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT
Date: October 14, 2021SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED
Date: September 30, 2021SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED
Date: December 16, 2021ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: November 09, 2021ORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Date: December 28, 2021CLERK'S DEFAULT
Date: December 22, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: September 02, 2020UNISSUED NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: September 30, 2021PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 4238817
Date: November 05, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 02, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: September 03, 2020SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: November 29, 2021MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: December 14, 2021SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED
Date: December 10, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: September 03, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: September 03, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: September 03, 2020LIS PENDENS
Date: September 04, 2020PAID $9.60 ON RECEIPT 3734685
Date: September 04, 2020PAID $1,946.00 ON RECEIPT 3734309
Date: September 04, 2020LIS PENDENS BOOK 31848 PAGE 485-486
Date: October 19, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: November 05, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: October 05, 2020UNISSUED NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: March 10, 2021DIRECTIONS TO CLERK
Date: September 30, 2021PAID $9.60 ON RECEIPT 3782983
Date: October 19, 2020NOTICE OF FILING
Date: March 10, 2021ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: November 17, 2020ORDER SETTING HEARING
Date: September 28, 2021ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: November 20, 2020NOTICE OF FILING
Date: September 30, 2021PROPOSED UNSIGNED ORDER
Date: December 14, 202112/14/2021
Date: January 16, 203812/28/2021
Date: January 16, 204211/20/2020
Date: January 19, 202403/10/2021
Date: January 22, 202410/20/2020
Date: January 15, 202403/10/2021
Date: January 21, 202410/14/2021
Date: January 30, 202409/02/2020
Date: January 02, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2042 | Docket Event | ORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |
January 16, 2041 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED | |
January 16, 2040 | Docket Event | CLERK'S DEFAULT | |
January 16, 2039 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED | |
January 16, 2038 | Docket Event | PROPOSED UNSIGNED ORDER | |
January 16, 2037 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
January 16, 2036 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED) | |
January 16, 2035 | Docket Event | ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
January 16, 2034 | Docket Event | PAID $20.00 ON RECEIPT 4238817 | |
January 16, 2033 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.