Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Benjamin Gonsher, Carolyn Gonsher, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Sean A Storani, against Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Royce B Badger, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with Glenn Kelley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGlenn Kelley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 12, 2020 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Benjamin Gonsher and Carolyn Gonsher against Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The plaintiffs allege that they had an insurable interest in a residential property located in Boca Raton, Florida, which was ins...
COMPLAINT
Date: March 12, 2020NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: June 24, 2020NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: March 12, 2020MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: March 12, 2020REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: March 12, 2020REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: March 12, 2020MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: April 17, 2020CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 12, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: March 12, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: March 12, 2020PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3581087
Date: March 13, 2020NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION
Date: April 17, 2020MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: March 25, 2020MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: April 30, 2020E-FILED DUPLICATE FILING
Date: April 17, 2020MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: March 12, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (F/B PLT) |
|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER DBO - DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER |
|
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INUSRNACE COMPANY'S AND/ OR STRIKE PLTS COMPLAINT F/B DFT |
|
April 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTS COMPLAINT F/B DFT |
|
April 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND ADDRESSES F/B ATTY BADGER OBO DFT |
|
April 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
E-FILED DUPLICATE FILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES |
|
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COVERAGE |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3581087 $411.00 3581087 Fully Paid |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
DIVISION ASSIGNMENT AE: Circuit Civil Central - AE (Civil) |
|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT F/B PLT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.