Case Last Refreshed: 1 hour ago
Department Of Revenue, Raquel D Alizon, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Donald Andrew Pickett, Moria Rozenson, Samuel Thomas Marshall, against Anray D Desanges, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with Sarah L. Willis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
Category4J Judicial Case |
Last RefreshedMay 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE F/B- RESP |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
GENERAL MAGISTRATE DISPOSITION FORM ROOM 6G DTD 6/18/2019 MAG. J. FANELLI |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL RAQUEL D. ALIZON |
|
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event | DISPOSED BY JUDGE | |
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON DEPARTMENT'S PETITION FOR ESTABLISHMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER AS ENFORCEABLE BY CONTEMPT POWERS OF THE COURT JUDGE WILLIS DTD 3/4/2019 BOOK 30454 PAGE 992-994 ON DEPARTMENT'S PETITION FOR ESTABLISHMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER AS ENFORCEABLE BY CONTEMPT POWERS OF THE COURT JUDGE WILLIS DTD 3/4/2019 |
|
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
DOMESTIC RELATIONS INFO AFF F/B- PET |
|
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
DOMESTIC RELATIONS INFO AFF F/B- RESP |
|
February 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING 03/01/2019 09:30:00 AM |
|
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO: RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR ESTABLISHMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER AS ENFORCEABLE BY CONTEMPT POWERS OF THE COURT F/B RESP RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR ESTABLISHMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER AS ENFORCEABLE BY CONTEMPT POWERS OF THE COURT F/B RESP |
|
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED) ANRAY DEON DESANGES 1/15/19 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.