Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Roberto M Vinces, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Stephanie Aragon, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with Maxine A. M. Williams presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryOther Domestic Relations |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
GENERAL MAGISTRATE DISPOSITION FORM ROOM 6F MAXINE A. M. WILLIAMS 09/24/2020 |
|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF NON-JURY TRIAL ON 9/24/20 DTD 9/24/20 MAG ZEITENBERG |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
WITHDRAWAL OF CLAIM MOTHER’S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT F.B RESP |
|
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
AMENDED ORDER ON MOTHER'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE (FILED 9/11/20) AND MOTHER'S MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS AS ORDERED ON 6/30/20 (FILED 9/11/20) (AMENDED AS TO PARAGRAPH D AND ATTACHMENT) - JDG CHARLES E BURTON - 9/23/20 |
|
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO USE CHARTS, SUMMARIES, GRAPHS, AND CALCULATIONS | |
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON MOTHER'S MOT FOR CONTINUANCE AND MOTHER'S MOT TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS AS ORDERED ON 06-30-20 DTD 09-21-20 BURTON ON MOTHER'S MOT FOR CONTINUANCE AND MOTHER'S MOT TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS AS ORDERED ON 06-30-20 DTD 09-21-20 BURTON |
|
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DATED JUNE 30,2020 | |
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING VIA ZOOM 09-21-20 AT 3:30PM DTD 09-15-20 ZEITENBERG |
|
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS AS ORDERRED ON JUNE 30 2020 FB RESP |
|
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE FB RESP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.