Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Valencia Pullens, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Stanley Davis, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with Jessica J. Ticktin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryDomestic Violence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED UNEXECUTED BY PBSO (ORDER SETTING HRG FOR MOTION TO MODIFY) |
|
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S MOTION TO MOFIDY/DISSOLVE INJUNCTION SIGNED BY J TICKTIN DATED 111219 PETITIONER'S MOTION TO MOFIDY/DISSOLVE INJUNCTION SIGNED BY J TICKTIN DATED 111219 |
|
November 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING THE FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION AND ANY ORDERS OF PROTECTION IN THESE RELATED CASES, ARE HEREBY DISSOLVED. THIS CASE IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY JUDGE JESSICA TICKTIN, DTD 11/13/19 BOOK 31052 PAGE 1025-1025 THE FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION AND ANY ORDERS OF PROTECTION IN THESE RELATED CASES, ARE HEREBY DISSOLVED. THIS CASE IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY JUDGE JESSICA TICKTIN, DTD 11/13/19 |
|
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING 11-13-19 AT 9AM CT ROOM 3 DTD 10-24-19 TICKTIN |
|
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
SET FOR DVHR - DVRV HEARING 11/13/2019 9:00 AM TICKTIN, JUDGEJESSICA DVHR - DVRV HEARING 11/13/2019 9:00 AM TICKTIN, JUDGEJESSICA |
|
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO MODIFICATION OF INJUNCTION F/B PETR TO MODIFICATION OF INJUNCTION F/B PETR |
|
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED ORDER SETTING HEARING |
|
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION TO MODIFY DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION SIGNED BY J TICKTIN DATED 07-31-19 PETITIONER'S MOTION TO MODIFY DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION SIGNED BY J TICKTIN DATED 07-31-19 |
|
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
SET FOR DVHR - DVRV HEARING 7/31/2019 9:00 AM TICKTIN, JUDGEJESSICA DVHR - DVRV HEARING 7/31/2019 9:00 AM TICKTIN, JUDGEJESSICA |
|
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING 7/31/2019 9:00 AM RM 3 TICKTIN DTD 7/9/2019 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.