Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bozena Puzio, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by William J Roe, against Tower Hill Prime Insurance Company, represented by Jonathan M Matzner, Matthew D Gottlieb, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: December 31, 2018ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 30858 PAGE 221-222
Date: August 27, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 02, 2019PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 2978645
Date: January 02, 2019NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: December 31, 2018MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: February 05, 2019NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION
Date: February 05, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 31, 2018MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: March 05, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2019NOTICE OF FILING
Date: December 31, 2018STIPULATION
Date: August 16, 2019REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: December 31, 2018COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 30858 PAGE 221-222 CURLEY DTD 8/27/2019 DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICT. |
|
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
DB PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT DBS - PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT |
|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION FOR FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLT BOZENA PUZIO (F/B DFT AND PLT) |
|
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS- F/B DEFT |
|
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT; F/B DFT TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OBO DFT TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY; F/B ATTY JONATHAN M MATZNER |
|
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS | |
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET FB PLTF |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 2978645 $411.00 2978645 Fully Paid |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
DIVISION ASSIGNMENT AA: Circuit Civil Central - AA (Civil) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.