Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ditech Financial Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Harrison Smalbach, Molly E Carey, William L Noriega, Malcolm E Harrison, against Sarah Mckenzie, Unknown Spouse Of Sarah Mckenzie, Unknown Tenant In Possession, represented by Malcolm E Harrison, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryHr Foreclosure > $50K, < $250K |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ORDER GRANTING H COATES DTD. 9/18/19 PLTFS MOTION TO STRIKE IS GRANTED.
Date: September 20, 2019NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY
Date: February 05, 2019NOTICE OF FILING
Date: December 31, 2018SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: January 29, 2019SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: January 29, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL
Date: April 03, 2019AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 13, 2019MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: February 18, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON CLERK'S DEFAULT. F/B PLT
Date: February 25, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL
Date: April 03, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 31, 2018CERTIFICATE
Date: December 31, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 31, 2018NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION
Date: January 07, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 31, 2018LIS PENDENS BOOK 30341 PAGE 969-970
Date: December 31, 2018PAID $945.60 ON RECEIPT 2978573
Date: January 02, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - F/B PLT
Date: April 26, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO DFTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS F/B PLT
Date: April 12, 2019NOTICE OF CHANGE OF:
Date: April 09, 2019PAID $19.10 ON RECEIPT 3374692
Date: October 18, 2019NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: April 04, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE
Date: August 26, 2019RELEASE/CANCEL LIS PENDENS BOOK 30969 PAGE 924-925
Date: October 18, 2019ORDER SETTING HEARING
Date: June 26, 2019SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED
Date: January 29, 2019PROPOSED UNSIGNED ORDER
Date: February 18, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 31, 2018ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 30, 2019CLERK'S DEFAULT
Date: February 25, 2019MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: April 10, 2019REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: April 04, 2019REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: April 04, 2019ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: April 03, 2019ANSWER
Date: January 31, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2018STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: December 31, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
PAID $19.10 ON RECEIPT 3374692 $19.10 3374692 Fully Paid |
|
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
RELEASE/CANCEL LIS PENDENS BOOK 30969 PAGE 924-925 AND INCORPORATED RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS FILED BY PLT |
|
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED AFTER OTHER DAO - DISPOSED AFTER OTHER |
|
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING H COATES DTD. 9/18/19 PLTFS MOTION TO STRIKE IS GRANTED. H COATES DTD. 9/18/19 PLTFS MOTION TO STRIKE IS GRANTED. |
|
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER SETTING SPECIAL SET HEARING |
|
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING COATES HEARING ON 9/18/19 @ 9:30AM CTRM 10E DTD 6/26/19 |
|
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES NOTICE OF SERVICE DFT'S FIRST SET F/B PLT |
|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLTF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS, FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION AND FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES FB PLTF OF SERVICE OF PLTF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS, FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION AND FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES FB PLTF |
|
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - F/B PLT OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - F/B PLT |
|
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO DFTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS F/B PLT OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO DFTS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS F/B PLT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.