Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Faviola Berdejo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Eric G Canter, against Jeffrey Orenstein, represented by John H Richards, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by Faviola Berdejo against Jeffrey Orenstein in the Circuit Court of the 15th Judicial Circuit in Palm Beach County, Florida. The complaint seeks damages in excess of $15,000.00, excluding interest, costs, and attorney's fees....
ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 29, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 31, 2018PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 2979021
Date: January 02, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 31, 2018NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY
Date: March 25, 2019REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: February 01, 2019STIPULATION
Date: July 23, 2019ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 30780 PAGE 1276-1276
Date: July 25, 2019RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION
Date: March 06, 2019NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY
Date: February 25, 2019RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: March 08, 2019REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: February 01, 2019NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: February 01, 2019NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: February 01, 2019ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: February 01, 2019REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: December 31, 2018COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2018REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: December 31, 2018NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: December 31, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 30780 PAGE 1276-1276 HAFELE DTD 7/25/2019 WITH PREJUDICE |
|
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE F/B PLT AND DFT |
|
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER DBO - DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER |
|
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES DEFENDANT'S ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES |
|
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY |
|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE DEFENDANT' S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF' S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS |
|
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY |
|
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE COLLATERAL SOURCE REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF FILED BY DFT |
|
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF FILED BY DFT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.