Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Scott E Modlin, against Fernando Rodriguez, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryContract & Debt |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is filed by American Express National Bank (formerly known as American Express Centurion Bank) against Fernando Rodriguez. The complaint states that American Express National Bank is seeking damages in the amount of $15,603.28, exclusi...
COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2018MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: April 18, 2019MOTION FOR WRIT
Date: June 14, 2019NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: August 06, 2019NOTICE (FIRST) TO DEFENDANT - VALLEY NATIONAL BANK FILED BY PLT
Date: July 09, 2019NOTICE (FIRST) TO DEFENDANT - JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NA FILED BY PLT
Date: July 09, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 31, 2018NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT
Date: April 18, 2019SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: January 17, 2019ANSWER OF GARNISHEE
Date: July 08, 2019MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: February 26, 2019CLERK'S DEFAULT
Date: March 06, 2019PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 2978387
Date: January 02, 2019DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 30564 PAGE 1336-1336
Date: April 24, 2019NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT
Date: February 26, 2019NOTICE OF FILING
Date: April 18, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 31, 2018AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS
Date: April 18, 2019WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED
Date: June 14, 2019SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: July 08, 2019WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED
Date: June 14, 2019SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED
Date: July 08, 2019PAID $170.00 ON RECEIPT 3214235
Date: June 19, 2019ANSWER OF GARNISHEE
Date: July 11, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT F/B PLT |
|
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF GARNISHEE F/B GARNISHEE JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A., |
|
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE (FIRST) TO DEFENDANT - VALLEY NATIONAL BANK FILED BY PLT (FIRST) TO DEFENDANT - VALLEY NATIONAL BANK FILED BY PLT |
|
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE (FIRST) TO DEFENDANT - JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NA FILED BY PLT (FIRST) TO DEFENDANT - JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NA FILED BY PLT |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF GARNISHEE FILED BY VALLEY NATIONAL BANK - GARNISHEE |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED) RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED VALLEY NATONAL BANK - 7/5/19 |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED RETURN OF SERVICE JP MORGAN CHASE BANK |
|
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
PAID $170.00 ON RECEIPT 3214235 $170.00 3214235 Fully Paid |
|
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT F/B PLT |
|
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED pleadings@lssmlaw.com;jaritsa.sanabria@lssmlaw.com;TEQUITA.COOLEY@LSSMLAW.COM TO BE SERVED UPON GARNISHEE JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.