Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sean T Schanda, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Stacey D Mullins, against Carla Giovaninna Larosa, represented by Dane Edward Leitner, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryOther Rp Actions = > $250K |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
This complaint is a Petition for Partition and Other Relief filed by the Plaintiff, Sean T. Schanda, against the Defendant, Carla Giovaninna Larosa. The action seeks to partition real property located at 19595 N. 66 Terrace, Jupiter, FL 33458, in Pal...
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: March 09, 2020ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 31291 PAGE 189-189
Date: March 09, 2020RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION
Date: August 26, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 06, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 06, 2019PAID $1,916.00 ON RECEIPT 2978215
Date: January 02, 2019SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: January 24, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 31, 2018NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION
Date: December 31, 2018ACCEPTANCE
Date: January 25, 2019NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION
Date: January 25, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL
Date: March 14, 2019NOTICE OF CANCELLATION
Date: March 21, 2019STIP SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: March 21, 2019NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: March 22, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 31, 2018ORD SUBSTITUTION COUNSEL
Date: March 22, 2019ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL
Date: November 06, 2019MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: February 26, 2019MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: October 08, 2019EVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LIST FILED
Date: December 13, 2019WITNESS LIST
Date: December 13, 2019NOTICE OF NON JURY TRIAL
Date: October 08, 2019PETITION
Date: December 31, 2018REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: July 25, 2019REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: April 09, 2019RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: October 10, 2019REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: August 26, 2019ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: August 05, 2019REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: July 25, 2019MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT F/B PLT
Date: July 18, 2019ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: March 20, 2019PETITION
Date: January 02, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL F/B PLT |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 31291 PAGE 189-189 J GOODMAN DTD 03/09/2020 AGREED FINAL - DISMISS THE PLTFS AMENDED PETITION FOR PARTITION AND RELATED RELIEF W/O PREJUDICE. |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER DBO - DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER |
|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
EVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LIST FILED PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST |
|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
WITNESS LIST PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST |
|
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL J GOODMAN DTD. 11/6/19 SET FOR 3/23/20 AND 5/15/20 |
|
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF |
|
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND PLAINTIFFS DEPOSITION FILED BY DFT |
|
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NON JURY TRIAL FILED BY PLT UP 10-11-19 |
|
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION F/B PLT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.