Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Grand View At Crestwood Condominium Association Inc, filed a(n) Liens - Creditor case represented by Scott J Wortman, against Nine Fours Llc, Unknown Tenant No 1, Unknown Tenant No 2, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryAssn Lien Foreclosure = < $50K |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeLiens |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Grand View at Crestwood Condominium Association, Inc. against Nine Fours LLC, Unknown Tenant No. 1, and Unknown Tenant No. 2. The plaintiff is seeking to foreclose a Claim of Lien for assessment on a pr...
COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2018CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 31, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 31, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 31, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 31, 2018SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED
Date: February 22, 2019NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY
Date: January 15, 2019SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: January 10, 2019SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: January 18, 2019LIS PENDENS BOOK 30340 PAGE 1548-1548
Date: December 31, 2018PAID $436.60 ON RECEIPT 2978205
Date: January 02, 2019NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: January 31, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2 |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJUDCIE AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS F/B PLTS ATTY |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event | DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER | |
January 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED) VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1 - 01/09/2019 |
|
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2 F/B PLT |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED) SERVED NINE FOURS LLC - 01/07/2019 |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
PAID $436.60 ON RECEIPT 2978205 $436.60 2978205 Fully Paid |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
DIVISION ASSIGNMENT AG: Circuit Civil Central - AG (Civil) |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.