Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Scott Williams, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gregory T Zele, against Geico General Insurance Company, represented by Amy Das, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by Scott Williams against GEICO General Insurance Company. The jurisdiction of the case is the Fifteenth Judicial Circuit in Palm Beach County, Florida. The case number is 50 2018 CA 016241 XXXX MB (AH). Scott Williams, the pl...
MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: March 07, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: January 02, 2019SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: February 08, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: March 25, 2019SUBPOENA ISSUED
Date: June 20, 2019ACCEPTANCE
Date: July 03, 2019ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 17, 2019SUBPOENA ISSUED
Date: May 30, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 31, 2018PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 2977502
Date: December 31, 2018NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: January 02, 2019ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Date: August 19, 2019NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: May 30, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2018ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL
Date: June 04, 2019NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: April 04, 2019PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 2979804
Date: January 03, 2019NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL
Date: May 29, 2019NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: April 04, 2019NOTICE OF EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF FILED BY DFT
Date: July 01, 2019SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED
Date: June 12, 2019REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: January 02, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT F/B PLT
Date: June 19, 2019ANSWER
Date: April 04, 2019REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: June 21, 2019RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION
Date: May 29, 2019REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: April 04, 2019NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY
Date: June 20, 2019ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 31, 2019RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: June 17, 2019REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: April 04, 2019RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: May 31, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL SMALL DTD 8/15/2019 WITH PREJUDICE |
|
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER DBO - DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER |
|
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
ACCEPTANCE OF PLT'S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT - F/B DFT |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF FILED BY DFT OF EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF FILED BY DFT |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES RESPONSE TO NOTICES OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY AND REQUEST FOR COPIES |
|
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA ISSUED SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM RECORDS CUSTODIAN ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP |
|
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES |
|
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT F/B PLT OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT F/B PLT |
|
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES |
|
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.