Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Paul Joseph Semande, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Baker & Zimmerman Pa Personal Injury Attorneys, Robert B Baker, represented by Harry A Shevin, Robert Zimmerman, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2018 |
CategoryLegal Malpractice |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: August 22, 2019MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT F/B PLT
Date: May 07, 2019ORDER J NUTT DTD. 4/11/19 MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO SERVE DEFT IS GRANTED.
Date: April 12, 2019MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: September 18, 2019MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: September 17, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: August 27, 2019ORDER J NUTT DTD. 8/21/19 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED.
Date: August 21, 2019MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: April 18, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: December 07, 2018MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: April 04, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: December 05, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED AFTER OTHER DAO - DISPOSED AFTER OTHER |
|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AGAINST DFTS ROBERT B. BAKER ESQ., INDIVIDUALLY AND BAKER & ZIMMERMAN P.A, PERSONAL INJURY ATTYS (F/B PLT) |
|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT F/B PLT OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT F/B PLT |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PAUL JOSEPH SEMANDE JR., ONLY (F/B DFT ROBERT B. BAKER) OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PAUL JOSEPH SEMANDE JR., ONLY (F/B DFT ROBERT B. BAKER) |
|
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY PLAINTIFF, PAUL JOSEPH SEMANDE, JR'S, NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY |
|
October 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES FILED BY ROBERT BAKER FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES FILED BY ROBERT BAKER |
|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS (AMENDED) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE F/B DFT ROBERT B BAKER |
|
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE F/B DFT ROBERT B. BAKER |
|
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL AS COUNSEL F/B ATTY SHEVIN OBO DFT ROBERT B BAKER |
|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT PLAINTIFF, PAUL JOSEPH SEMANDE, JR'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT ROBERT B. BAKER COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.