Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The Federal Saving Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Alicia Whiting-Bozich, Jennifer Mouser Scott, against Aberdeen Property Owners Association, Inc., Fairway Lakes Drive Association, Inc., Maurice I Wilinsky, Oxford Place At Aberdeen Association Inc, Unknown Tenants Owners 1, (total of 7) See All represented by Scott B Chapman, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with Jaimie R. Goodman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 16, 2018 |
CategoryHr Foreclosure = > $250K |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a verified mortgage foreclosure complaint filed by The Federal Savings Bank against Maurice L. Wilinsky and various associations and unknown tenants/owners. The complaint alleges that The Federal Savings Bank is the holder of the or...
08/15/2019
Date: January 16, 2067ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: August 22, 2018NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT
Date: December 17, 2018REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: November 14, 2018MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 25, 2019AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS
Date: June 07, 2019ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAW
Date: May 09, 2019ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAW
Date: April 30, 2019CLERK'S DEFAULT
Date: March 20, 2019NOTICE OF FILING
Date: June 07, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: May 02, 2019MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: April 29, 2019PAID $140.00 ON RECEIPT 3248704
Date: July 15, 2019LIS PENDENS BOOK 30066 PAGE 1659-1659
Date: August 16, 2018CERTIFICATE
Date: August 16, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: August 16, 2018SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: August 27, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: August 16, 2018STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: August 16, 2018SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: September 05, 2018PROPOSED UNSIGNED ORDER
Date: October 01, 2018NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT
Date: March 18, 2019PROPOSED UNSIGNED ORDER
Date: March 18, 2019STIP SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: April 03, 2019NOTICE OF FILING
Date: April 19, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: May 09, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 16, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: August 16, 2018NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION
Date: September 24, 2018PAID $1,980.60 ON RECEIPT 2803257
Date: August 17, 2018NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY
Date: September 13, 2018CERTIFICATE
Date: August 16, 2018SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: August 28, 2018CLERK'S DEFAULT
Date: October 04, 2018REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: August 27, 2018ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: November 09, 2018SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: August 28, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: August 16, 2018COMPLAINT
Date: August 16, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: August 16, 2018AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS
Date: February 25, 2019NOTICE OF FILING
Date: April 19, 2019SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: August 28, 2018MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: September 24, 2018MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: April 04, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: April 05, 2019MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: December 17, 2018MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: October 01, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL
Date: April 03, 2019NOTICE OF FILING
Date: June 19, 2019PAID $280.70 ON RECEIPT 3281585
Date: August 07, 2019RETURNED MAIL
Date: July 08, 2019FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET
Date: June 26, 2019NOTICE OF CHANGE OF:
Date: June 25, 2019NOTICE OF FILING
Date: June 26, 2019FORECLOSURE PROCESS SALE - 7-31-2019
Date: July 31, 2019PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: July 19, 2019RETURNED MAIL
Date: August 07, 2019FORECLOSURE CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT - 7-31-2019
Date: August 15, 2019CERTIFICATE OF TITLE BOOK 30828 PAGE 1871-1871
Date: August 15, 2019FORECLOSURE CERTIFICATE OF SALE - 7-31-2019
Date: July 31, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: February 25, 2019MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: March 18, 201907/31/2019
Date: January 16, 206308/15/2019
Date: January 16, 206807/19/2019
Date: January 16, 206108/07/2019
Date: January 16, 206608/07/2019
Date: January 16, 206506/26/2019
Date: January 16, 205407/31/2019
Date: January 16, 206206/19/2019
Date: January 16, 205307/15/2019
Date: January 16, 206007/08/2019
Date: January 16, 205905/09/2019
Date: January 16, 205006/25/2019
Date: January 16, 205706/07/2019
Date: January 16, 205106/26/2019
Date: January 16, 205806/26/2019
Date: January 16, 205506/07/2019
Date: January 16, 205204/30/2019
Date: January 16, 204604/19/2019
Date: January 16, 204405/02/2019
Date: January 16, 204804/29/2019
Date: January 16, 204505/09/2019
Date: January 16, 204904/04/2019
Date: January 16, 204103/18/2019
Date: January 16, 203504/19/2019
Date: January 16, 204304/05/2019
Date: January 16, 204212/17/2018
Date: January 31, 202409/24/2018
Date: January 22, 202410/11/2018
Date: January 27, 202410/04/2018
Date: January 26, 202404/03/2019
Date: January 16, 204003/20/2019
Date: January 16, 203804/03/2019
Date: January 16, 203903/18/2019
Date: January 16, 203703/18/2019
Date: January 16, 203602/25/2019
Date: January 16, 203402/25/2019
Date: January 16, 203302/25/2019
Date: January 16, 203212/17/2018
Date: January 30, 202408/28/2018
Date: January 18, 202409/24/2018
Date: January 23, 202408/28/2018
Date: January 16, 202411/14/2018
Date: January 29, 202411/09/2018
Date: January 28, 202410/01/2018
Date: January 24, 202410/01/2018
Date: January 25, 202408/28/2018
Date: January 19, 202409/05/2018
Date: January 20, 202409/13/2018
Date: January 21, 202408/27/2018
Date: January 15, 202408/27/2018
Date: January 17, 202408/17/2018
Date: January 13, 202408/22/2018
Date: January 14, 202408/16/2018
Date: January 10, 202408/16/2018
Date: January 11, 202408/16/2018
Date: January 09, 202408/16/2018
Date: January 05, 202408/16/2018
Date: January 07, 202408/16/2018
Date: January 04, 202408/16/2018
Date: January 06, 202408/16/2018
Date: January 08, 202408/16/2018
Date: January 03, 202408/16/2018
Date: January 02, 202408/16/2018
Date: January 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2068 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT - 7-31-2019 | |
January 16, 2067 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE BOOK 30828 PAGE 1871-1871 | |
January 16, 2066 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
January 16, 2065 | Docket Event | PAID $280.70 ON RECEIPT 3281585 | |
January 16, 2064 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE FEES ADDED - 7-31-2019 | |
January 16, 2063 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE CERTIFICATE OF SALE - 7-31-2019 | |
January 16, 2062 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE PROCESS SALE - 7-31-2019 | |
January 16, 2061 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
January 16, 2060 | Docket Event | PAID $140.00 ON RECEIPT 3248704 | |
January 16, 2059 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.