Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Norma Castellon, Yovani Castellon, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Andrew M Brodsky, Chastity Grace Delgado, Glenda M Almela, Jennifer Jimenez, Samuel Gold, (total of 5) See All against Southern Fidelity Insurance Company, represented by Jennifer Jimenez, Lauren Maione-Walsh, Michelle E. Hardin, Tamar Gelin, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 06, 2017 |
CategoryContract & Debt |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is filed by Yovani Castellon against Southern Fidelity Insurance Company. The plaintiff alleges that they suffered a loss due to a roof leak, which is a covered peril under the defendant's insurance policy. The plaintiff provided the d...
NOTICE OF REPRESENTATIVE ATTENDING MEDIATION F/B DFT
Date: May 11, 2020NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION
Date: November 27, 2017NOTICE F/B PLT
Date: November 08, 2017NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: January 04, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: November 06, 2017NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: November 08, 2017PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 2408349
Date: November 08, 2017NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: January 05, 2018NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: July 07, 2020RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: November 14, 2018NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION
Date: November 15, 2018RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: January 16, 2019NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: July 07, 2020NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL
Date: February 19, 2020WITNESS LIST
Date: June 24, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: July 17, 2020SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED
Date: August 07, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: July 17, 2020ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: September 02, 2020SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED
Date: August 07, 2020NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION
Date: August 27, 2020ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL
Date: July 14, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: July 17, 2020NOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE
Date: July 17, 2020MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: October 07, 2020MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: October 07, 2020NOTICE PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED VERDICT FORM
Date: March 22, 2021NOTICE OF FILING
Date: September 24, 2020ORDER SETTING HEARING
Date: March 15, 2021MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: March 22, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: November 06, 2017MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: March 22, 2021MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: March 22, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: March 29, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: December 28, 2017RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: January 08, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL
Date: November 27, 2017ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 17, 2018NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION
Date: July 27, 2018NOTICE OF FILING
Date: July 12, 2018NOTICE OF CANCELLATION
Date: April 05, 2019AMENDED NOTICE TAKING DEPO
Date: May 10, 2018NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: October 16, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: April 10, 2019NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: June 20, 2018ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: May 06, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: April 10, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL
Date: April 26, 2019ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL
Date: March 10, 2020NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION
Date: November 07, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL
Date: May 06, 2019MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: April 06, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 30, 2021NOTICE OF FILING
Date: September 24, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: September 16, 2020MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: August 06, 2020NOTICE OF CANCELLATION
Date: November 07, 2019ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: September 02, 2020MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: October 07, 2020MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: October 07, 2020MOTION FOR ORDER
Date: October 14, 2020AMENDED NOTICE TAKING DEPO
Date: October 23, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: March 29, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: October 07, 2020MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: October 07, 2020AMENDED NOTICE TAKING DEPO
Date: October 30, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: October 27, 2020NOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE
Date: October 22, 2020REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: October 07, 2020NOTICE OF CANCELLATION
Date: November 05, 2020ORDER SETTING HEARING
Date: October 20, 2020MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: April 19, 2021MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: April 19, 2021MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: April 19, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: April 19, 2021NOTICE OF FILING
Date: December 08, 2020ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL
Date: December 10, 2020AMENDED NOTICE TAKING DEPO
Date: November 10, 2020ORDER SETTING HEARING
Date: November 19, 2020REPLY/RESPONSE
Date: October 28, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: December 10, 2020NOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE
Date: December 22, 2020NOTICE OF CANCELLATION
Date: January 14, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: December 11, 2020MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: March 22, 2021MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: March 28, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 29, 2021NOTICE PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: March 22, 2021PRETRIAL STIPULATION
Date: March 22, 2021MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: April 06, 2021MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: April 25, 2021ORDER SETTING HEARING
Date: July 22, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: June 20, 2021NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: June 20, 2021ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: July 21, 2021RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: July 20, 2021ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL
Date: April 29, 2021RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: July 20, 2021MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: April 25, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: June 23, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: April 14, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL
Date: April 07, 2021NOTICE OF FILING
Date: April 13, 2021MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: April 19, 2021MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: April 19, 2021NOTICE OF FILING
Date: April 09, 2021MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: April 19, 2021REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: April 13, 2021ORDER GKELLEY DTD 4/15/21 ON DFTS MOTION TO COMPEL PLTS UPDATE DEPOSITIONS -DENIED
Date: April 15, 2021MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: April 19, 2021MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: April 07, 2021MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: April 19, 2021MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: April 19, 2021NOTICE DEFENDANT'S REOUEST FOR ZOOM TRIAL APPEARANCE
Date: April 19, 2021MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: April 19, 2021MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: April 19, 2021MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: April 25, 2021RE-NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: April 19, 2021NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: June 20, 2021MOTION TO DETERMINE BURDENS OF PROOF FILED BY DFT
Date: April 25, 2021RESPONSE TO: IN OPPOSITION TO DFT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLT'S EXPERT PETER LEMUS CGC (F/B PLTS)
Date: September 09, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: April 25, 2021WITNESS LIST
Date: September 08, 2021NOTICE OF FILING
Date: September 09, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: August 19, 2021WITNESS LIST
Date: February 15, 2022MOTION DEFENDANT'S AMENDED MOTION TO DETERMINE BURDENS OF PROOF
Date: August 18, 2021WITNESS LIST
Date: February 15, 2022ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: July 20, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: June 20, 2021NOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE
Date: September 08, 2021MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 16, 2022MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: October 29, 2021NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: October 08, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: July 07, 2020MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: July 07, 2020REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: July 14, 2020REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: July 07, 2020WITNESS LIST
Date: June 24, 2020NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: May 06, 2020NOTICE OF SERVING DFT'S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLT NORMA CASTELLON - F/B DFT
Date: June 18, 2020MEDIATION REPORT
Date: June 09, 2020REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: May 10, 2019ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 20, 2019RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: June 20, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: April 25, 2019NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: May 10, 2019MOTION AMENDED TO JOIN AN INDISPENSABLE PARTY F/B DFTS ATTY
Date: April 10, 2019MOTION TO JOIN AN INDISPENSABLE PARTY F/B DFT
Date: April 01, 2019RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: May 23, 2018ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 23, 2018MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: May 01, 2018NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: April 27, 2018ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 07, 2018NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY
Date: January 18, 2018ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: December 04, 2017NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: December 28, 2017REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: January 24, 2018REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: December 28, 2017RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION
Date: January 17, 2018RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: January 17, 2018REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: November 08, 2017REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: November 08, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: November 06, 2017RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: August 13, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
WITNESS LIST PLAINTIFF'S FACT WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST |
|
February 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
WITNESS LIST PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE REQUESTING THAT DEFENSE COUNSEL AND DEFENDANT BE INSTRUCTED NOT TO MAKE DISPARAGING REMARKS ABOUT PLAINTIFF OR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY AND CONFLICT | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER ZUCKERMAN DTD 10/5/21: ON PRE-TRIAL MOTIONS GRANTED & GRANTED IN PART ** SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS ** ZUCKERMAN DTD 10/5/21: ON PRE-TRIAL MOTIONS GRANTED & GRANTED IN PART ** SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS ** |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO: IN OPPOSITION TO DFT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLT'S EXPERT PETER LEMUS CGC (F/B PLTS) IN OPPOSITION TO DFT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLT'S EXPERT PETER LEMUS CGC (F/B PLTS) |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF FILING CASE LAW IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S DAUBERTMOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS' EXPERT, PETER LEMUS, P.E. |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
WITNESS LIST DEFENDANT'S AMENDED WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LISTS |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE CHANGE OF ATTY OF RECORD WITHIN FIRM; DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; GLENDA A. ALMELA ESQ., FROM THE PROPERTY ADVOCATES P.A, AS NEW ATTY OF RECORD (F/B GLENDA A. ALMELA ESQ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.