Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Beverly Levine, Keith Levine, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by James H Hicks, against David Giles, Edwin Giles, Overland Construction Company Inc, represented by James Orrin Williams, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with James B. Williams, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 27, 2017 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by Beverly Levine and her husband, Keith Levine, against Overland Construction Company, Inc. and Edwin Giles. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of Giles, who was operating a motor vehicle owned by Overland and colli...
RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION
Date: August 24, 2017RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION
Date: August 24, 2017RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: August 24, 2017RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION
Date: August 24, 2017RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: August 24, 2017RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION
Date: August 24, 2017ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 24, 2017ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 24, 2017REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: January 03, 2018NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: November 17, 2017MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTIES F/B DFTS
Date: January 16, 2018MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: January 08, 2018ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 24, 2017REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: January 03, 2018MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: January 08, 2018MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: January 08, 2018REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: January 17, 2018MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: January 08, 2018MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: January 08, 2018MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: January 08, 2018DISCLOSURE
Date: December 29, 2017NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT, EDWIN GILES F/B PLTS
Date: November 16, 2017ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 03, 2018NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: January 03, 2018STIPULATION
Date: January 15, 2018NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: January 17, 2018NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: January 30, 2018RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: January 26, 2018ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: February 16, 2018NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: June 27, 2017REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: July 27, 2017NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: July 24, 2017NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT CIVIL
Date: August 28, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: June 27, 2017REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: June 27, 2017REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: June 27, 2017NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: June 27, 2017REQUEST
Date: September 22, 2017NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: July 27, 2017ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 24, 2017MOTION TO LIMIT THE SCOPE OF THE COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION (F/B PLT BEVERLY LEVINE)
Date: September 25, 2017ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 24, 2017NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY
Date: September 14, 2017RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: August 24, 2017ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 24, 2017NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: March 09, 2018REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: October 23, 2017REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: October 05, 2017REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: November 08, 2017REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: July 24, 2017REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: July 27, 2017MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: February 28, 2018ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 29881 PAGE 1090-1091
Date: May 22, 2018PRETRIAL STIPULATION
Date: March 16, 2018REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: March 01, 2018NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: November 10, 2017ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: February 16, 2018RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: February 26, 2018STIPULATION
Date: May 17, 2018ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Date: May 17, 2018MEDIATION REPORT
Date: March 29, 2018RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: February 16, 2018ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: February 16, 2018RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: February 20, 2018ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: February 20, 2018SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: July 10, 2017PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 2236810
Date: June 28, 2017CERTIFICATE
Date: September 19, 2017NOTICE OF JURY TRIAL
Date: September 21, 2017EVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LIST FILED
Date: December 28, 2017SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: June 27, 2017NOTICE OF SERVICE
Date: August 28, 2017NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION
Date: July 24, 2017NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: July 27, 2017NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: July 24, 2017NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: August 09, 2017CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 27, 2017RESPONSE TO: (SUPPLEMENTAL) PLTS REQUEST TO PRODUCE F/B DFT OVERLAND CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC
Date: December 29, 2017SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: June 27, 2017CERTIFICATE
Date: November 14, 2017SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: July 10, 2017ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: July 21, 2017NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: August 09, 2017WITNESS LIST
Date: December 28, 2017NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: February 01, 2018CERTIFICATE
Date: December 27, 2017CERTIFICATE
Date: August 22, 2017RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: February 16, 2018SUPPLEMENT
Date: February 26, 2018WITNESS LIST
Date: January 25, 2018ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL
Date: September 27, 2017EVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LIST FILED
Date: January 26, 2018CERTIFICATE
Date: October 03, 2017NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: October 26, 2017SUGGESTION
Date: October 26, 2017NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: January 03, 2018DISCLOSURE
Date: December 29, 2017WITNESS LIST
Date: January 25, 2018SUPPLEMENT
Date: January 03, 2018NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: January 17, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: February 01, 2018CERTIFICATE
Date: January 26, 2018NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: February 01, 2018EVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LIST FILED
Date: March 12, 2018WITNESS LIST
Date: February 26, 2018NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: March 07, 2018NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT F/B DFT OVERLAND CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC
Date: February 16, 2018EVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LIST FILED
Date: February 26, 2018NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: March 21, 2018MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: March 20, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 29881 PAGE 1090-1091 M SASSER DTD 5/22/18 BASED ON SETTLEMENT |
|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER | |
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION AND FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE F/B PLT |
|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL SASSER: WITH PREJUDICE AND CLOSING FILE (NOT SIGNED OR DATED) |
|
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER E GARRISOIN: DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE APPLICABLE DISMISSAL PAPERS: WITHIN 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. DTD 4-26-18 E GARRISOIN: DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE APPLICABLE DISMISSAL PAPERS: WITHIN 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. DTD 4-26-18 |
|
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
MEDIATION REPORT SETTLED |
|
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COPIES F/B DFTS OVERLAND CONSTRUCTION COMPANY AND EDWIN GILES |
|
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION IN LIMINE F/B DFTS OVERLAND CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC AND DAVID GILES AS THE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF EDWIN GILES |
|
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
PRETRIAL STIPULATION F/B PLT |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
EVIDENCE/EXHIBIT LIST FILED FILED BY PLTF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.