Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Aubin Wade Robinson filed a(n) Municipal Ordinance case against Daniel Lemieux, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with Debra Moses Stephens presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2024 |
CategoryMunicipal Ordinance |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
|
08/05/2016
Date: January 06, 202408/31/2016
Date: January 11, 202408/04/2016
Date: January 03, 202408/19/2016
Date: January 07, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT FORM | |
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event | CAPIAS ISSUED | |
January 07, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, ADD ATTORNEY | |
January 06, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | CRIM PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.