Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Prince Wilcox, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Shakelia Josey, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2016 |
CategoryPaternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 28685 PAGE 4-5 OF PETITION FOR PATERNITY DTD 11-02-16 TICKTIN |
|
November 02, 2016 | Docket Event | DISPOSED BY JUDGE | |
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING DATE OCTOBER 19, 2016 AT 3:00 PM, AT THE SOUTH COUNTY COURTHOUSE, COURTROOM 3 DTD ON 072016 BY JUDGE TICKTIN |
|
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NON JURY TRIAL F/B PETITIONER |
|
July 11, 2016 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
PAID $60.00 ON RECEIPT 1725842 $60.00 1725842 Fully Paid |
|
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
DISCLOSURE FOR FAMILY MEDIATION FEES; F/B PETITIONER |
|
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER -REFERRAL TO CT MEDIATOR JULY 8 2016 8:30AM DTD 6-17-16 JUDGE TICKTIN |
|
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event | CLERK'S DEFAULT | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR MEDIATION F/B PETITIONER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.