Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Benjamin Ho filed a(n) County To Circuit Appeal case in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with Thomas H. Barkdull, III presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 19, 2016 |
CategoryCounty To Circuit Appeal |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
|
07/07/2017
Date: January 22, 202410/19/2016
Date: January 02, 202406/16/2017
Date: January 21, 202405/04/2017
Date: January 20, 202404/11/2017
Date: January 19, 202402/10/2017
Date: January 12, 202404/11/2017
Date: January 17, 202402/15/2017
Date: January 14, 202401/24/2017
Date: January 09, 202403/29/2017
Date: January 16, 202403/20/2017
Date: January 15, 202412/27/2016
Date: January 07, 202401/17/2017
Date: January 08, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | MANDATE | |
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | OPINION | |
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event | BRIEF | |
January 21, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR EXT OF TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF 07/07/2017. NO ADD'L EXT OF TIME WILL BE GRANTED-SENT TO ALL PARTIES | |
January 20, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION APPELLANT’S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO SERVE REPLY BRIEF-UP- | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | ANSWER BRIEF | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ATTY'S FEES F/B APPELLEE-UP- | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | APPENDIX | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR EXT OF TIEM TO FILE RESPONSE IS GRANTED. APPELLANT TO SERVE ANSWER 04/11/2017. SENT TO ALL PARTIES | |
January 15, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.