Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Marilyn Tafuri, Peter Tafuri, Robert Brancaccio, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with Charles E. Burton presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 13, 2015 |
CategoryGuardian Advocate |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | DOCKET NBR ASSIGNED IN ERROR | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING GDNSHP PLAN ANNUAL FROM 12/01/22 - 11/30/23 S/B JDG C. BURTON DTD 03/31/23 |
|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
CLERKS REVIEW OF GDNSHP PLAN ANNUAL 12/01/2022-11/30/2023 |
|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
ANNUAL GUARDIANSHIP PLAN 12/1/22-11/30/23 F/B ATTY HAZELTINE OBO M TAFURI, R BRANCACCIO & P TAFURI |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO TRANSFER TO DIVISION IZ ORDER DIRECTING CLERK & COMPTROLLER TO TRANSFER CASE TO DIVISION "IZ" (OTIZ) GLENN D. KELLEY 07/27/2022 |
|
April 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING GDNSHP PLAN FOR PERIOD 12/1/2021-11/30/2022 |
|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
CLERKS REVIEW OF GDNSHP PLAN ANNUAL 12/01/2021-11/30/2022 |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
ANNUAL GUARDIANSHIP PLAN 12/1/21-11/30/22 F/B ATTY HAZELTINE OBO M TAFURI, R BRANCACCIO & P TAFURI |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING GDNSHP PLAN FOR 12/1/20 - 11/30/21 S/B JUDGE L LAURIE DTD 3/12/2021 |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
CLERKS REVIEW OF GDNSHP PLAN ANNUAL 12/01/2020-11/30/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.