Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Versailles Villas Association Inc, filed a(n) Liens - Creditor case represented by Allen Edgar Rossin, Sebastian K Poprawski, Thomas E Rossin, against Unknown Tenant #1, Unknown Tenant #2, Wilmington Trust Company, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2015 |
CategoryAssn Lien Foreclosure = < $50K |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeLiens |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: July 10, 2015REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: April 23, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$8.40 was made on receipt CAMB1011916. Filed by PLAINTIFF VERSAILLES VILLAS ASSOCIATION INC |
|
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$.10 was made on receipt CAMB1011917. Filed by PLAINTIFF VERSAILLES VILLAS ASSOCIATION INC |
|
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$27.60 was made on receipt CAMB1010782. Filed by PLAINTIFF VERSAILLES VILLAS ASSOCIATION INC |
|
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLT Filed by PLAINTIFF VERSAILLES VILLAS ASSOCIATION INC |
|
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event | DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER | |
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET FILED BY PLT Filed by PLAINTIFF VERSAILLES VILLAS ASSOCIATION INC |
|
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLT SEE REPLY Filed by PLAINTIFF VERSAILLES VILLAS ASSOCIATION INC |
|
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED WILMINGTON TRUST COMPANY AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE TO BANK OF AMERICA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO LASSALLE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE FOR MORGAN STANLEY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2007- 15AR MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2007D; PLEADING OR OTHER DOCUMENT WAS FILED; COPIES FURNISHED TO ESERVICE@STJOHNROSSIN |
|
March 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT, WILMINGTON TRUST COMPANY, AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE TO BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION F/B PLT Filed by PLAINTIFF VERSAILLES VILLAS ASSOCIATION INC |
|
March 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT F/B DFT Filed by DEFENDANT WILMINGTON TRUST COMPANY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.