Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Deborah L Hackimer, John Hackimer, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Alejandro Alvarez, Philip Freidin, Randy Rosenblum, against Liggett Group Llc, Lorillard Tobacco Company, Philip Morris - Usa Inc, R J Reynolds Tobacco Company, Rj Reynolds Tobacco Company, (total of 6) See All represented by Anitra F Raiford, Eileen Tilghman Moss, Elizabeth L Fite, Frank Cruz-Alvarez, Geri E Howell, (total of 13) See All in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with Meenu T. Sasser presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2014 |
CategoryOther Negligence |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: March 17, 2015REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: February 06, 2015ORDER
Date: April 22, 2015REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: November 20, 2014VERIFIED MOTION
Date: April 06, 2015ORDER
Date: April 10, 2015NOTICE
Date: November 30, 2015MOTION
Date: December 16, 2015REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: April 19, 2016NOTICE
Date: November 30, 2015RESPONSE TO:
Date: April 29, 2015RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: July 31, 2015NOTICE
Date: December 01, 2015RESPONSE TO:
Date: February 10, 2016DISCLOSURE
Date: March 28, 2016WITNESS LIST
Date: March 28, 2016MOTION
Date: November 10, 2015REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: March 11, 2016NOTICE OF INTENT
Date: March 31, 2016NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: March 14, 2016MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT F/B PLT/PET
Date: March 23, 2016ORDER
Date: February 23, 2016ORDER
Date: January 05, 2016DISCLOSURE
Date: June 08, 2016REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: May 13, 2016RESPONSE TO: TO DFT'S OMINBUS MOTION IN LIMINE (F/B PTL)
Date: August 01, 2016RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION
Date: May 24, 2016NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF EXPERT WITNESS F/B DFT RJ REYNOLDDS
Date: June 09, 2016NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF EXPERT WITNESS F/B PLTS
Date: June 10, 2016WITNESS LIST
Date: May 13, 2016ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 22, 2016ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 17, 2016REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: June 28, 2016MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: July 08, 2016ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 17, 2016ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 26, 2016RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: May 11, 2016RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION
Date: June 22, 2016AMENDED ORDER
Date: June 02, 2016MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: July 18, 2016RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION
Date: July 15, 2016MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: July 18, 2016MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: July 18, 2016MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: July 18, 2016MOTION
Date: July 08, 2016MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: July 08, 2016MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: July 18, 2016MOTION
Date: July 18, 2016MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: July 18, 2016MOTION TO EXCLUDE CERTAIN GOVERNMENT REPORTS FILED BY DFTS
Date: July 18, 2016MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: July 18, 2016MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: July 18, 2016MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: July 18, 2016MOTION TO PRECLUDE THE HEARSAY TESTIMONY OF PLTS GENERIC WITNESSES FILED BY DFTS
Date: July 18, 2016MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: July 08, 2016MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: July 18, 2016MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: July 18, 2016MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: July 18, 2016MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: July 18, 2016MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: July 18, 2016MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: July 18, 2016MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: July 18, 2016MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: July 18, 2016MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: July 18, 2016MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: July 18, 2016MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: July 18, 2016RESPONSE TO: DEFTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON MRS. HACKIMER CLAIMS F/B/PLTFS
Date: July 26, 2016MOTION REQUESTING USE OF A JUROR QUESTIONNAIRE (F/B DFTS)
Date: July 18, 2016MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: July 18, 2016MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: July 18, 2016MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: July 18, 2016NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: July 26, 2016REPLY/RESPONSE
Date: July 26, 2016NOTICE OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE SPECULATIVE TESTIMONY (F/B PLT)
Date: August 01, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
MANDATE AFFIRMED |
|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION (SECOND AMENDED) F/B ATTY FREIDIN OBO PLTS |
|
August 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER CLOSING FILE: CASE CLOSED DUE TO STATISTICAL PURPOSES. DTD 8-29-17 M SASSER CLOSING FILE: CASE CLOSED DUE TO STATISTICAL PURPOSES. DTD 8-29-17 M SASSER |
|
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER GRANTING DFT R J REYNOLDS MOTION FOR ATTYS FEES AND COSTS - GRANTED. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. DTD 6/28/17 MEENU SASSER GRANTING DFT R J REYNOLDS MOTION FOR ATTYS FEES AND COSTS - GRANTED. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. DTD 6/28/17 MEENU SASSER |
|
May 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING SPECIAL SET: BEFORE JUDGE SASSER RM 9C ON 6-29-17 AT 9:30 AM ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES. DTD 5-16-17 M SASSER |
|
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
AUTOMATIC RECEIPT APPELLATE FILING TRANSCRIPTS |
|
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
AUTOMATIC RECEIPT APPELLATE FILING RECORD |
|
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
PAID $122.00 ON RECEIPT 2104969 $122.00 2104969 Fully Paid |
|
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event | INDEX TO RECORD ON APPEAL | |
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event | TRANSCRIPT INCLUDED IN RECORD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.