Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2013 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 07, 2022 |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
ORDER FINDING PROBABLE CAUSE
Date: August 25, 2013ORDER RECISION NO CONTACT ORD
Date: September 09, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER RECISION NO CONTACT ORD | |
September 06, 2013 | Docket Event | NF/NP RESCIND NO CONTACT ORD | |
September 06, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NO FILE ON COUNT 1 | |
September 06, 2013 | Docket Event | NO FILE | |
September 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Cancelled AR - ARRAIGNMENT on 9/9/2013 1:00:00 PM due to CASE DISPOSED | |
August 30, 2013 | Docket Event | REPORT CONDITIONS SUPERVISION | |
August 25, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER FINDING PROBABLE CAUSE | |
August 25, 2013 | Docket Event | CONTINUE ANY RECOMMENDED TREATMENT | |
August 25, 2013 | Docket Event | CRIM PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT | |
August 25, 2013 | Docket Event | APPL AND AFF OF INDIGENCY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.