Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with Janis Brustares Keyser presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2014 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE BOOK 26926 PAGE 44 | |
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON-WAIVER OF THE REQUIREMENT TO PREPARE AND FILE A FINAL ACCOUNTING AND OBJECTION TO THE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE'S REOUEST TO WAIVE SAID REQUEST | |
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event | DISPOSED BY JUDGE | |
June 27, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER STRIKING CLAIM | |
June 26, 2014 | Docket Event |
PROBATE CHECKLIST E-FILED |
|
June 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR DISCHARGE F/B: ADRIENNE NEWBERG E-FILED |
|
June 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
REPORT OF DISTRIBUTION F/B: ADRIENNE NEWBERG E-FILED |
|
June 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT/STMNT RE: CREDITORS F/B: ADRIENNE NEWBERG E-FILED |
|
June 24, 2014 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR ORDER STRIKING CLAIM OF W.P.R.F., INC. FOR FAILURE TO COMMENCE LNDEPENDENT ACTION Filed by PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE ADRIENNE NEWBERG | |
May 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL, 06/30/14 - 07/22/14 AND 07/28/14 - 08/08/14, F/B: CEIL SCHNEIDER RANDELL E-FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.