Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2011 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2022 |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Date: June 08, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) | |
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED ORDINANCE ORDINANCE DISMISSED |
|
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
RECALLED OTHER |
|
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Warrant CISS-12-001524 Signed On 02/02/2012 CISS-12-001524 02/02/2012 Warrant/Capias - CISS-12-001524 signed on: 02-FEB-12 |
|
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT FORM | |
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event | EVENT NOT HELD - FTA | |
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
CAPIAS ISSUED Docket associated to count(s): 1, 2 -- $50.00 CT #1 AND $50.00 CT #2 CISS-12-001524 |
|
January 25, 2012 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT FILING FEE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.