Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Leslie Kaposi, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with DELRAY TRAFFIC INFRACTION presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2011 |
CategoryHandicap Parking |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
REQUEST
Date: February 08, 2012ORDER GRANTING
Date: February 14, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event | STOP TAG ISSUED | |
March 19, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE/PARKING CITATION RECEIPT | |
January 04, 2013 | Docket Event | STOP TAG ISSUED | |
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE/PARKING CITATION RECEIPT | |
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event | CLOSED CASE | |
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING Docket associated to count(s): 1 -- BLUMBERG |
|
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event | CLOSED CASE | |
February 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
REQUEST DISMISSAL DOCUMENTS FILED |
|
February 08, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT OF FILING FEE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.