Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Christopher Kasper, Deena Pacelli Gray, Rodney X Celestin, Zakkiyyah T White, against Ana K Piedrahita, Any And All Unknown Parties Claiming By, Through, Under And, Boca Cove Home Condominium Association Inc, Ruben Piedrahita, Unknown Tenant #1, (total of 8) See All represented by Emily E Gannon, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryHr Foreclosure > $50K, < $250K |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 26692 PAGE 350
Date: March 25, 2014STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: December 31, 2012ANSWER
Date: January 17, 2014ORDER
Date: February 11, 2014MOTION
Date: November 04, 2013COMPLAINT
Date: November 04, 2013ORDER
Date: December 19, 2013ANSWER
Date: January 30, 2013COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS |
|
July 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
CHECK PRINTED A Disbursment of $51,500.00 on Check Number 57263 to DISB WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. |
|
June 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO T & J PROPERTY ASSOCIATES, LLC |
|
June 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE SOLD TO T&J PROPERTY ASSOCIATES LLC FOR $51,500 |
|
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE FEES ADDED A Foreclosure Fees Payment of $1,200.50 was made on receipt CAMB898461. Filed By |
|
May 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of $2,575.00 was made on receipt CAMB898460. Filed By |
|
May 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE Filed by PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK NA |
|
May 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
BID SHEET INFORMATION SHEET ISSUED (NO PROOF OF PUBLICATION) |
|
May 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of $50,125.50 was made on receipt CAMB896027. Filed By |
|
May 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE SALE FEE ADDED Filed by PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK NA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.