Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Als V-Ccg Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Jamie Epstein, Jonathan Ian Meisels, Laura Ashley Jackson, Melissa Konick, against David H Ramirez, Laura Maria Vargas, Unknown Spouse Of David H Ramirez Aka David Ramirez, Unknown Spouse Of Laura Maria Vargas, Unknown Tenant #1, (total of 7) See All represented by Scott J Wortman, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryHr Foreclosure = > $250K |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 26425 PAGE 452
Date: October 30, 2013MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 06, 2013MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: March 04, 2013ORDER
Date: May 02, 2013ORDER GRANTING
Date: March 07, 2013ANSWER
Date: January 10, 2013ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: January 25, 2013ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: February 06, 2013COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2012STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: December 31, 2012MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 03, 2013MOTION
Date: March 15, 2013REPLY/RESPONSE
Date: February 26, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$50.00 was made on receipt CAMB1033204. Filed by PLAINTIFF ALS V-CCG LLC |
|
April 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED WRIT OF POSSESSION ON DAVID H RAMIREZ POSTING WRIT OF POSSESSION ON PROPERTY ON 4/1/14 Filed by DEFENDANT DAVID H RAMIREZ |
|
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOVANT'S FAILURE TO PAY RE-OPEN FEE |
|
March 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO 11233 THYME DR PALM BEACH GARDENS FL 33418 TO ARK LOAN SOLUTIONS V-CCG LLC PBSO-EDW WPO-14-001760 Filed by DEFENDANT DAVID H RAMIREZ |
|
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event | REDISPOSED | |
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING WRIT OF POSSESSION FOR FAILURE TO VACATE PREMISES GRANTED D LEWIS DTD 03/27/14 |
|
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING MARCH 27, 2014@8:45AM/. MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESION FOR FAILURE TO VACATE PREMISES. F/B ATTY Filed by ATTORNEY RYAN TABLES |
|
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR WRIT MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FOR FAILURE TO VACATE PREMISES FILED BY PLT Filed by PLAINTIFF ALS V-CCG LLC |
|
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event | REOPEN | |
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
CAFF/REOPEN ($50.00) Filed by PLAINTIFF ALS V-CCG LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.