Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Deena Pacelli Gray, Scott Goldstein, against Burgundy E Association Inc, Ruth Mullins, Unknown Spouse Of Ronald Martin Tieger, Unknown Spouse Of Ruth Mullins, Unknown Tenant #1, (total of 8) See All represented by Gina Marie Grandinette, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with Division AW presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 05, 2012 |
CategoryHr Foreclosure = < $50K |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Wells Fargo Bank, NA against the defendants. The plaintiff alleges that they hold a superior lien on a property located in Palm Beach County, Florida, which is secured by a mortgage. The defendants, inc...
05/07/2013
Date: January 27, 202409/17/2013
Date: January 16, 203309/17/2013
Date: January 16, 203205/07/2013
Date: January 28, 202406/11/2013
Date: January 29, 202404/11/2013
Date: January 26, 202402/25/2013
Date: January 25, 202401/30/2013
Date: January 24, 202401/28/2013
Date: January 23, 202401/28/2013
Date: January 22, 202401/28/2013
Date: January 21, 202401/28/2013
Date: January 20, 202401/28/2013
Date: January 19, 202401/28/2013
Date: January 18, 202401/17/2013
Date: January 17, 202411/05/2012
Date: January 14, 202411/05/2012
Date: January 15, 202411/05/2012
Date: January 13, 202411/05/2012
Date: January 12, 202411/05/2012
Date: January 11, 202411/05/2012
Date: January 10, 202411/05/2012
Date: January 07, 202411/05/2012
Date: January 06, 202411/05/2012
Date: January 08, 202411/05/2012
Date: January 05, 202411/05/2012
Date: January 09, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2033 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BOOK 26330 PAGE 1202 | |
January 16, 2032 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET | |
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT | |
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
January 28, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION | |
January 27, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION | |
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.