Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Delray Pd Jacobson 540 filed a(n) Handicap Parking case against Talytha D Knapp, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with DANIEL HAVERMAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2024 |
CategoryHandicap Parking |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
|
01/17/2012
Date: January 08, 202411/09/2011
Date: January 02, 202411/09/2011
Date: January 03, 202402/27/2012
Date: January 12, 202402/27/2012
Date: January 13, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2024 | Docket Event | DISMISSED AT OFFICERS REQUEST | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING | |
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event | OBTS RESEND AFTER CORRECTIONS | |
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT FORM | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | PLEA OF NOT GUILTY | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | UNIFORM CODE CITATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.