Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Heidi Kauzlick, Stephen Kauzlick, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with Division AJ presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2011 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
MOTION
Date: September 13, 2012AGREEMENT
Date: February 06, 2012MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: March 07, 2013REQUEST
Date: August 13, 2012STIPULATION
Date: November 15, 2013MOTION
Date: March 07, 2013REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: February 21, 2013MOTION
Date: April 02, 2013MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: August 09, 2013RESPONSE TO:
Date: August 21, 2012ORDER
Date: March 26, 2013ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 26503 PAGE 465
Date: December 11, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 26503 PAGE 465 J MARX |
|
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event | REOPEN | |
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event | REDISPOSED | |
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET DJ J MARX |
|
November 26, 2013 | Docket Event | DISPOSED - OTHER | |
November 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET DO J MARX CLOSE FILE |
|
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION "JOINT" FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
August 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DFT F/B ATTY O'DONNELL Filed by ATTORNEY MARIA CORVAIA O'DONNELL |
|
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION CANCELLED HEARING ON RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON 5-13-2013 AT 8:30 A.M. F/B MARIA O'DONNELL ATTY FOR DFT. CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORP. Filed by ATTORNEY MARIA CORVAIA O'DONNELL |
|
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER ON CANCELLATION OF HEARING ON RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY.IUDGMENT IS CANCELLED ON 5/13/13 JMARX |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.