Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Municipal Ordinance case against Mark A Patterson, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with Laura S. Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2024 |
CategoryMunicipal Ordinance |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
|
08/05/2009
Date: January 07, 202408/05/2009
Date: January 04, 202408/05/2009
Date: January 05, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | EVENT HELD | |
January 07, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT FORM | |
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | PLEA SHEET | |
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF RIGHTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.