Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Municipal Ordinance case against Donald A Wright, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with Paul A. Damico presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2024 |
CategoryMunicipal Ordinance |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
|
04/24/2009
Date: January 18, 202401/20/2017
Date: January 20, 202403/26/2009
Date: January 12, 202401/23/2009
Date: January 06, 202402/26/2009
Date: January 08, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT FORM | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | CAPIAS ISSUED | |
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT FORM | |
January 06, 2024 | Docket Event | PROBABLE CAUSE AFF/CITAT/COMPL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.