Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC V SIMPSON, STEPHEN
On August 07, 2008 a real property/foreclosure case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 07, 2008
Last Refreshed
September 08, 2023
Filing Location
Palm Beach County, FL
Category
REAL PROPERTY/FORECLOSURE
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
MOTION FOR WRIT
Date: Mar 03, 2010ORDER
Date: Sep 22, 2009ORDER
Date: Sep 14, 2009MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: May 18, 2009AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 18, 2009ANSWER
Date: Oct 10, 2008REQUEST
Date: Sep 29, 2008ANSWER
Date: Sep 29, 2008MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: Sep 17, 2008Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
PAID $50.00 ON RECEIPT 1839592 $50.00 1839592 Fully Paid |
|
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
CHECK PRINTED A Disbursment of $100.00 on Check Number 59014 to SHARON R BOCK CLERK & COMPTROLLER |
|
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
COPY DISB REQUEST FOR SHARON R BOCK, CLERK & COMPTROLLER, UNCLAIMED FUNDS F.S. 116.21 |
|
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
CHECK PRINTED A Disbursment of $100.00 on Check Number 52884 to MARKS GRAY PA |
|
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
COPY DISB REQUEST FOR MARKS GRAY PA, ANSWER FILED 3/19/2011 |
|
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOVANT'S FAILURE TO PAY RE-OPEN FEE |
|
September 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER DISBURSING COURT REGISTRY FUNDS: IS DIRECTED TO DIRBURSE ALL FUNDS: K STERN DTD 9/6/13 |
|
September 11, 2013 | Docket Event | REDISPOSED | |
September 03, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS FROM REGISTRY OF THE COURT FILED BY MARINE CONSTRUCTION INC Filed by DEFENDANT MARINE CONSTRUCTION INC | |
September 03, 2013 | Docket Event | REOPEN | |
September 03, 2013 | Docket Event | CAFF/REOPEN ($50.00) | |
November 08, 2011 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
October 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE BOOK 24824 PAGE 0127 ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF |
|
October 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS |
|
October 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL CURRENT TENANTS |
|
October 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of $200.70 was made on receipt CAMB607742. Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
October 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$70.00 was made on receipt CAMB607735. Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
October 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE FEES ADDED A Foreclosure Fees Payment of $200.70 was made on receipt CAMB607743. Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
October 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE SALE FEE ADDED Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
October 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
BID SHEET INFORMATION SHEET ATTACHED |
|
October 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE SOLD TO PLT FOR $20,100.00 |
|
August 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER AS ATTORNEYS FOR WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. |
|
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
June 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE 10/13/11 AURORA LOANS SERVICES LLC VS STEPHEN SIMPSON Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC 10/13/2011 |
|
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER RESETTING 10/13/11 6/15/11 RESCHEDULED SALE DATE 10/13/11 DTD JUNE 15TH 2011 LUBITZ CANCEL 6/15/11 |
|
June 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
EMERGENCY MOTION DEFENDANTS. STEPHEN SIMPSON'S AND KRISTINA SIMPSON'S AGREED EMERGENCY MOTION TO POSTPONE FORECLOSURE SALE Filed by DEFENDANT STEPHEN SIMPSON |
|
June 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON 06/15/2011 @ 8:45AM STEPHEN SIMPSON'S AND KRISTINA SIMPSON'S AGREED EMERGENCY MOTION TO POSTPONE FORECLOSURE SALE |
|
June 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL LAW OFFICES OF DAVID J STERN |
|
May 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER FROM POPKIN & ROSALER PA Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
May 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE 6/15/11 AURORA LOAN SERVICES, LLC VS STEPHEN SIMPSON Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
May 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ORDERED THE LAW FIRM OF POPKIN & ROSALER, PA IS HEREBY SUBSTITUTED FOR THE LAW OFFICES OF DAVID J STERN. DTD MAY 13, 2011 JUDGE SASSER |
|
May 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER LAW FIRM OF POPKIN & ROSALER IS SUBISUTED FOR DAVID J STERN DTD 5/13/11 SASSER |
|
April 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
April 15, 2011 | Docket Event | REDISPOSED | |
April 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR MAY 13, 2011 AT 1:30PM IN CTRM 10-H. DTD APRIL 15, 2011 JUDGE BLANC |
|
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER RESETTING 6/15/11 RESCHEDULED SALE DATE 6/15/11 DTD MARCH 14TH 2011 HARRISON |
|
March 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION TO FORECLOSURE SALE . MOTION TO VAVATE FORECLOSURE SALE AND MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
March 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO FORECLOSURE SALE, MOTION TO VACATE FORECLOSURE SALE AND MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE HEARING IS SET FOR 3/14/11 |
|
March 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
BID SHEET INFORMATION SHEET ATTACHED |
|
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$50.00 was made on receipt CAMB525951. Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event | REOPEN | |
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL & FOR CONTINUANCE Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
CAFF/REOPEN ($50.00) Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
January 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
January 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE HAS AUTHORITY TO BID ON BEHALF OF AURORA LOAN SERVICES, LLC Filed By ATTORNEY SETH M KARASIK |
|
September 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL (CURRENT TENANTS) FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE |
|
September 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL (CURRENT TENANTS) NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE |
|
July 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED BY JUDGE Associated to docket FJFC filed on 2010-07-01 |
|
July 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
DOR FORECLOSURE FORM AMENDED Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
July 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE 3/7/11 AURORA LOAN VS STEPHEN SIMPSON PUB PBDBR FEB 18 & 25, 2011 03/07/2011 |
|
July 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE, MORTGAGE AND COPY OF RECORDED ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
July 01, 2010 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET | |
July 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 024035 PAGE 00152 $781,728.17 SALE DATE 3/7/11 DTD JULY 1, 2010 HARRISON $781,728.17 Mar 7 2011 12:00AM Jul 1 2010 12:00AM $781,728.17 SALE DATE 3/7/11 DTD JULY 1, 2010 HARRISON |
|
June 09, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING SET FOR 03-30-2010 Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
March 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT AND ORDER OF DISBURSEMENT 3/30/10 |
|
March 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF GARNISHEE FROM WACHOVIA BANK. |
|
March 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT RETURNED SERVED 3/5/10 ON WACHOVIA BANK. |
|
March 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT. Filed by DEFENDANT MARINE CONSTRUCTION INC |
|
March 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED TO GARNISHEE, WACHOVIA BANK-COUNTER-- WGA-10-000692 |
|
March 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$85.00 was made on receipt CAMB388410. |
|
March 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Registry Deposit of $103.00 was receipted on receipt CAMB388413. The registry fees due on this deposit are $3.00. Filed By |
|
March 03, 2010 | Docket Event | ISSUANCE OF WRITS - CA | |
March 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Registry Deposit Fee of $3.00 was receipted on receipt CAMB388414. Associated with Registry Deposit receipted on receipt CAMB388413. Filed By |
|
November 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 09/21/09 AS TO CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT |
|
October 06, 2009 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED | |
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 3/16/09 F@ 1:30 |
|
September 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER MOTION FOR CONTEMPT IS HEREBY GRANTED DTD 09/22/09 |
|
September 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER CONTINUING WRIT OF WAGE GARNISHMENT. (M.SASSER) |
|
September 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED CERTIFIED COPY OF CONTINUING WRIT OF WAGE GARNISHMENT TO GARNISHEE, FITE, SHAVELL & ASSOCIATES-COUNTER P/U-- WGA-09-002549 |
|
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND TAXATION OF ATTY FEES AND COSTS Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY JOHN DOE AND JANE DOE Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
August 31, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTY OF RECORD |
|
August 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Registry Deposit of $103.00 was receipted on receipt CAMB329689. The registry fees due on this deposit are $3.00. Filed By |
|
August 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
ISSUANCE OF WRITS - CA Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
August 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Registry Deposit Fee of $3.00 was receipted on receipt CAMB329690. Associated with Registry Deposit receipted on receipt CAMB329689. Filed By |
|
August 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$85.00 was made on receipt CAMB329686. Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
August 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT. *UP 8/12/09 W/UNSIGNED ORDER* **UP 9/10/09 W/UNSIGNED ORDER** Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
July 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 23329 PAGE 756 (SUMMARY)- ORDERED THAT CROSS PLT MARINE CONSTRUCTION INC SHALL HAVE AND RECOVER FROM THE CROSS DEFENDANT STEPHEN SIMPSON THE TOTAL SUM OF $21,880.06 PLUS INTEREST AT A RATE OF 8% PER ANNUM JULY 7, 2009 JUDGE |
|
June 08, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (EXPERT) IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTYS FEES Filed by DEFENDANT MARINE CONSTRUCTION INC |
|
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST CROSS-DEFT STEPHEN SIMPSON Filed by DEFENDANT MARINE CONSTRUCTION INC |
|
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF DANIEL COSTON IN SUPPORT OF MARINE CONSTRUCTION'S MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFTS STEPHEN SIMPSON AND KRISTINA T. SIMPSON Filed by DEFENDANT MARINE CONSTRUCTION INC |
|
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTYS FEES Filed by DEFENDANT MARINE CONSTRUCTION INC |
|
January 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT AS TO CROSSCLAIM, STEPHEN SIMPSON, KRISTINA T SIMPSON |
|
November 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
November 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
October 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 10/21/08 Filed by DEFENDANT KRISTINA T SIMPSON |
|
October 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 10/21/08 Filed by DEFENDANT STEPHEN SIMPSON |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT Filed by DEFENDANT MARINE CONSTRUCTION INC |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$324.60 was made on receipt CAMB249918. Filed by DEFENDANT MARINE CONSTRUCTION INC |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
FEE/CROSS,CNTR CLAIM,3RD PRTY Filed by DEFENDANT MARINE CONSTRUCTION INC |
|
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
FEE/LIS PENDENS ($5.60) Filed by DEFENDANT MARINE CONSTRUCTION INC |
|
September 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Filed by DEFENDANT NATIONAL CITY BANK |
|
September 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO COMPLAINT Filed by DEFENDANT NATIONAL CITY BANK |
|
September 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Filed by DEFENDANT NATIONAL CITY BANK |
|
September 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANS AND CROSS-CLAIM Filed by DEFENDANT MARINE CONSTRUCTION INC |
|
August 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 8-13-08 Filed by DEFENDANT MARINE CONSTRUCTION INC |
|
August 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) NOT SERVED Filed by DEFENDANT JOHN DOE |
|
August 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 8-14-08 Filed by DEFENDANT NATIONAL CITY BANK |
|
August 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 8-14-08 Filed by DEFENDANT KRISTINA T SIMPSON |
|
August 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 8-14-08 Filed by DEFENDANT STEPHEN SIMPSON |
|
August 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) NOT SERVED Filed by DEFENDANT JANE DOE |
|
August 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$373.10 was made on receipt CAMB234831. Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
August 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-138843 Filed by DEFENDANT MARINE CONSTRUCTION INC |
|
August 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-138842 Filed by DEFENDANT NATIONAL CITY BANK |
|
August 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS BOOK 024203 PAGE 00639 Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
August 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-138845 Filed by DEFENDANT STEPHEN SIMPSON |
|
August 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
FEE/LIS PENDENS ($5.60) Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
August 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
August 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
August 07, 2008 | Docket Event | PENDING | |
August 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-138844 Filed by DEFENDANT KRISTINA T SIMPSON |
|
August 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-138846 Filed by DEFENDANT JANE DOE |
|
August 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-138847 Filed by DEFENDANT JOHN DOE |
|
August 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
CAFF Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
August 07, 2008 | Docket Event | ADDITIONAL COMMENTS |