Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Andrew L Fivecoat, against Lake Charleston Maintenance Association Inc, Rafael Delvalle, Tenant # 1, Tenant #2, Tenant # 3, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with Division AW presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2008 |
CategoryReal Property/Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedMay 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This is an in rem action to foreclose a mortgage on real property located and situated in Palm Beach County, Florida. It is an action to re-establish a lost Mortgage Note pursuant to Section 673.3091, Florida Statutes. Plaintiff owns the Mortgage Not...
SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: January 31, 2008SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: January 31, 2008FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 022970 PAGE 00150
Date: November 19, 2008NOTICE
Date: September 02, 2008FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET
Date: November 19, 2008MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: August 06, 2008RETURNED MAIL
Date: December 08, 2008SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED)
Date: April 04, 2008CERTIFICATE
Date: January 20, 2009DEFAULT
Date: September 15, 2008NOTICE OF FILING
Date: November 19, 2008CERTIFICATE OF TITLE BOOK 23042 PAGE 209
Date: January 20, 2009SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED)
Date: April 04, 2008NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: October 30, 2008MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 01, 2008SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED)
Date: April 04, 2008SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: January 31, 2008SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: January 31, 2008SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED)
Date: April 04, 2008CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Date: December 29, 2008LIS PENDENS
Date: January 31, 2008BID SHEET
Date: December 29, 2008DOR FORECLOSURE FORM
Date: November 19, 2008CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 31, 2008COMPLAINT
Date: January 31, 2008PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: December 18, 2008NOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION
Date: April 28, 2008AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 28, 2008ANSWER
Date: February 08, 2008SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED)
Date: February 27, 2009SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED)
Date: April 04, 2008NOTICE OF SALE
Date: November 19, 2008NOTICE OF FILING
Date: October 30, 2008NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: November 19, 2008AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 28, 2008AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 06, 2008SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: January 31, 2008WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED
Date: February 02, 2009PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: May 22, 2008NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: August 01, 2008NOTICE OF FILING
Date: November 19, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 02/07/09 Filed by DEFENDANT RAFAEL DELVALLE |
|
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO 6806 TORCH KET STREET LAKE WORTH FL. 33467 TO PLT..PBSO WPO-09-000598 Filed by DEFENDANT RAFAEL DELVALLE |
|
January 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS |
|
January 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE BOOK 23042 PAGE 209 ISSUED TO DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY |
|
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE FEES ADDED A Foreclosure Fees Payment of $70.70 was made on receipt CAMB269288. Filed by PLAINTIFF DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS |
|
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of $70.70 was made on receipt CAMB269287. Filed by PLAINTIFF DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS |
|
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE SOLD TO PLTF FOR $100.00 |
|
December 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
BID SHEET BANNER & LAPTOP RECEIPT ATT |
|
December 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE Filed by PLAINTIFF DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS |
|
December 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL Filed by DEFENDANT RAFAEL DELVALLE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.