Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Hsbc Bank Usa National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Robert A Smith Jr, against Charles V Maida, Saratoga At Royal Palm Property Owners Association Inc, Unknown Tenant No 1, Unknown Tenant No 2, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2008 |
CategoryReal Property/Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is in response to foreclosure papers that were served to the defendant, Charles V Maida Jr. The defendant is requesting a delay in the foreclosure to allow time to sell the property as a "short sale" or to sign a deed in lieu of forecl...
RESPONSE TO:
Date: February 21, 2008COMPLAINT
Date: January 28, 2008MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 16, 2008NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BOOK 022667 PAGE 01905
Date: May 22, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BOOK 022667 PAGE 01905 OF ACTION |
|
May 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING Associated to docket NOVD filed on 2008-05-22 |
|
May 22, 2008 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET | |
April 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT Filed by DEFENDANT SARATOGA AT ROYAL PALM PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF ATTYS FEES AND COSTS Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF ATTYS FEES Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK USA NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) NOT SERVED Filed by DEFENDANT UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2 |
|
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 02/02/08 Filed by DEFENDANT CHARLES V MAIDA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.