Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Hsbc Mortgage Services Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Joseph R Rushing, against Fabian Vera, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Tenant # 1, Tenant #2, Tenant # 3, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with Peter D. Blanc presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2008 |
CategoryReal Property/Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ORDER
Date: June 16, 2008RESPONSE TO:
Date: February 06, 2008ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED OUT
Date: January 06, 2011ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: February 20, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED OUT PER ORDER DATED 12/20/10 CHIEF JUDGE PETER D BLANC |
|
December 20, 2010 | Docket Event | REOPEN | |
December 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
REDISPOSED Associated to docket ADCO filed on 2011-01-06 |
|
February 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE ATTY FEES Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
|
June 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
ORDER DISMISSING CASE AND CANCELING NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS- DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE JUNE 16, 2008 JUDGE COLBATH****ORIG DOCS RTND 7/29/08**** |
|
June 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
ORDER DISMISSING CASE, CANCELING NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS AND RETURN ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE TO PLT AND PHOTOSTATIC COPIES SHALL BE SUBSTITUTED IN THIER PLACE: GRANTED JUNE 16,2008 JIDGE J. COLBATH |
|
June 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER Associated to docket ORD filed on 2008-06-16 |
|
June 10, 2008 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET | |
June 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS CASE AND CANCEL NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
|
April 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO AMOUNTS DUE AND OWING Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.