Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bette Verp, Martin Verp, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Geri Sue Straus, against Porta Bella Yacht & Tennis Club Condominium Association Inc, represented by Gary I Masel, James E Zloch, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2008 |
CategoryOther Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: March 11, 2008REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: January 28, 2008ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 11, 2008REQUEST
Date: February 14, 2008COMPLAINT
Date: January 28, 2008ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 31, 2008REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: February 22, 2008REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: April 23, 2008REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: April 03, 2008REPLY/RESPONSE
Date: February 25, 2008NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY
Date: April 11, 2008ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 31, 2008RESPONSE TO:
Date: May 01, 2008REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: March 31, 2008ANSWER
Date: February 14, 2008RESPONSE TO:
Date: March 31, 2008AGREED ORDER
Date: August 29, 2008SUPPLEMENT
Date: September 04, 2008RESPONSE TO:
Date: December 04, 2008REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: July 11, 2008MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: November 20, 2008NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY
Date: July 01, 2008ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 16, 2008ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 16, 2008NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY
Date: November 23, 2009REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: November 25, 2009NOTICE
Date: December 01, 2009ORDER
Date: April 08, 2009RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: May 01, 2009REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: September 17, 2008RESPONSE TO:
Date: February 11, 2009OBJECTION
Date: March 30, 2009NOTICE
Date: November 30, 2009RESPONSE TO:
Date: April 06, 2009NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY
Date: November 09, 2009REQUEST
Date: April 02, 2009NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: November 25, 2009STIPULATION AND ORDER
Date: February 08, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL E GARRISON |
|
January 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPO Filed by DEFENDANT PORTA BELLA YACHT & TENNIS CLUB CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC |
|
January 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET DB E GARRISON |
|
January 12, 2010 | Docket Event | DISPOSED AFTER OTHER | |
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION LAWRENCE DOMBROWSKI 1-15-09 AT 1 PM Filed by ATTORNEY GERI SUE STRAUS |
|
January 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION SEE LIST |
|
December 17, 2009 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED | |
December 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE LIST OF NAMES & ADDRESSES OF ALL REBUTTAL WITNESSES Filed by DEFENDANT PORTA BELLA YACHT & TENNIS CLUB CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC |
|
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NO-OBJECTION Filed by ATTORNEY JAMES E ZLOCH |
|
December 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE SERVING SUPPLEMENTAL/EXPERT INTERROGS Filed by DEFENDANT PORTA BELLA YACHT & TENNIS CLUB CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.