Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Aurora Loan Services Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Mark C Elia, against Indrani Horton, Mayfair At Wellington Condominium Inc, Unknown Spouse Of Indrani Horton, Unknown Tenant #1 In Possession Of The Subject Property, Unknown Tenant #2 In Possession Of The Subject Property, (total of 5) See All represented by Michael S Feldman, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2008 |
CategoryReal Property/Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
EMERGENCY MOTION
Date: January 30, 2009EMERGENCY MOTION
Date: January 27, 2009FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 022771 PAGE 01019
Date: July 11, 2008ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: February 06, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED JAN 27 09 Filed by DEFENDANT INDRANI HORTON |
|
February 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL AS TO JEFF COBB |
|
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION IS DENIED. SIGNED 01/30/09 JUDGE J. COOK |
|
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
REDISPOSED Associated to docket ORD filed on 2009-02-02 |
|
January 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
EMERGENCY MOTION AS TO JEFF COBBS - EMERGENCY MOTION |
|
January 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING STAY. THE WRIT OF POSSESSION SERVED ON JEFF COBB ON 01/23/09 AT 2105 WINGATE BEND #519 WELLINGTON FL 33414 IS HEREBY STAYED UNTIL NOON ON 02/03/09 - SIGNED 01/28/09 JUDGE J. COOK |
|
January 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
EMERGENCY MOTION JEFF COBB (TENANT)/ TO COURT ( PRO SE) |
|
January 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$50.00 was made on receipt CAMB276620. Filed by PLAINTIFF AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC |
|
January 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
REOPEN Filed by DEFENDANT UNKNOWN TENANT #1 IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY |
|
January 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
CAFF/REOPEN ($50.00) Filed by DEFENDANT UNKNOWN TENANT #1 IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.