Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Lindsey Diehl, against Fluturije Sela, Nafi Sela, Tenant # 1, Tenant #2, Tenant # 3, (total of 7) See All represented by Drew Melville, Luis D Carreja, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2008 |
CategoryReal Property/Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a civil action filed by Wells Fargo Bank, NA against Nafi Sela, Fluturuje Sela, and any unknown parties claiming an interest in the property. The complaint is for mortgage foreclosure. The plaintiff alleges that a promissory note an...
ORDER
Date: March 26, 2010MOTION
Date: October 01, 2009MOTION
Date: March 26, 2010NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: February 24, 2010COMPLAINT
Date: January 25, 2008MOTION
Date: June 09, 2010ANSWER
Date: February 11, 2008AGREED ORDER
Date: July 30, 2010ORDER
Date: January 14, 2010FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 023738 PAGE 00274
Date: February 24, 2010MOTION
Date: September 02, 2009STIPULATION
Date: July 30, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL TENANT #1 SERVED AS NEHEMIE LEGKAND |
|
September 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS |
|
September 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO WELLS FARGO BANK, NA |
|
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL 7/23/10 |
|
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. |
|
July 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of $690.70 was made on receipt CAMB443830. Filed by PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK NA |
|
July 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE FEES ADDED A Foreclosure Fees Payment of $690.70 was made on receipt CAMB443831. Filed by PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK NA |
|
July 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE SOLD TO WELLS FARGO BANK FOR $90,100.00 |
|
July 15, 2010 | Docket Event | BID SHEET | |
July 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$70.00 was made on receipt CAMB438665. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.