Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION V MILLER, MICHAEL EARL
On January 28, 2008 a contract & debt case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL. Judge Catherine M. Brunson presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 28, 2008
Last Refreshed
September 08, 2023
Filing Location
Palm Beach County, FL
Category
CONTRACT & DEBT
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Active
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I - BREACH OF CONTRACT (Against MILLER)
COUNT II - BREACH OF THIRD-PARTY BENEFICIARY CONTRACT (Against SERGIO and LIZETTE)
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
MEMORANDUM
Date: Feb 27, 2017NOTICE OF INTENT
Date: Jun 30, 2016SATISFACTION BOOK 28391 PAGE 1324-1324
Date: Jun 21, 2016ORDER ON DFTS CLAIMS OF EXEMPTION - DENIED DTD 5/13/16 CATHERINE BRUNSON
Date: May 18, 2016MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: Apr 18, 2016ANSWER
Date: Apr 18, 2016REQUEST
Date: Apr 18, 2016ANSWER
Date: Apr 18, 2016REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: Apr 18, 2016AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS
Date: Apr 18, 2016MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FILED BY REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION
Date: Apr 13, 2016MOTION FOR WRIT
Date: Jan 19, 2016MOTION FOR WRIT
Date: Jan 19, 2016MEMORANDUM
Date: Dec 17, 2013ORDER
Date: Dec 08, 2011AMENDED ORDER
Date: Oct 19, 2011ORDER
Date: Oct 12, 2011MOTION
Date: Sep 16, 2011ORDER/RULE TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: Feb 23, 2010MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: Feb 02, 2010ORDER
Date: Dec 02, 2009MOTION
Date: Dec 02, 2009ORDER
Date: Nov 09, 2009MOTION
Date: Nov 03, 2009MOTION
Date: Oct 06, 2009ORDER
Date: Jul 24, 2009MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: Jul 21, 2009NOTICE
Date: Jul 21, 2009REQUEST
Date: Jul 21, 2009REQUEST
Date: Jul 21, 2009NOTICE
Date: Jul 21, 2009REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: Jul 21, 2009REQUEST
Date: Jul 21, 2009NOTICE
Date: Jul 21, 2009AFFIDAVIT
Date: Jul 21, 2009REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: Jul 21, 2009REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: Jul 21, 2009ORDER
Date: Jul 08, 2009ORDER
Date: Jun 11, 2009MOTION
Date: Jun 04, 2009ORDER
Date: May 20, 2009MOTION
Date: May 12, 2009MOTION
Date: Apr 30, 2009MOTION
Date: Apr 30, 2009ORDER
Date: May 06, 2008MOTION
Date: Apr 21, 2008AMENDED
Date: Mar 21, 2008COMPLAINT
Date: Mar 10, 2008COMPLAINT
Date: Jan 28, 2008Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM FROM JUDGE ROWE DTD 2/23/17 TO ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE CASE |
|
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA FILED BY REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION BOOK 28391 PAGE 1324-1324 OF JUDGMENT IN GARNISHMENT AS TO WELLS FARGO BANK (F/B JUDGMENT HOLDER) |
|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON DFTS CLAIMS OF EXEMPTION - DENIED DTD 5/13/16 Catherine Brunson ON DFTS CLAIMS OF EXEMPTION - DENIED DTD 5/13/16 Catherine Brunson |
|
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 28314 PAGE 1852-1852 IN GARNISHMENT THAT PLTF RECOVERS AGAINST GARNISHEE REGIONS BANK $4,420.47, LET EXECUTION ISSUE F/WITH. DTD 5/16/16 CATHERIN BRUNSON |
|
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL MAILED TO MICHAEL EARL MILLER |
|
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION VACATE JUDGMENT, IMPROPER SERVICE F\B DFT, LIZETTE BAEZ VACATE JUDGMENT, IMPROPER SERVICE F\B DFT, LIZETTE BAEZ |
|
May 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
PAID $2.00 ON RECEIPT 1642425 $2.00 1642425 Fully Paid |
|
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT IN GARNISHMENT FILED BY PLT |
|
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO DFTS CLAIM OF EXEMPTION |
|
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DFT SERGIO BAEZ FILED BY PLT |
|
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO DFTS CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED BY PLT |
|
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO GARNISHEE, REGIONS BANK FILED BY PLT |
|
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS AFFIDAVIT OF POST JUDGMENT INTEREST AND COSTS FILED BY PLT |
|
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER ALLOWING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE: ON 5-2-16 AT 1:15 PM. SEE ORDER. DTD 4-15-16 C BRUNSON ALLOWING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE: ON 5-2-16 AT 1:15 PM. SEE ORDER. DTD 4-15-16 C BRUNSON |
|
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FILED BY REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FILED BY REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING TO DEFENDANT OF GARNISHEE'S ANSWER F\B PLT, REGEND HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING MAY 2, 2016 AT 1:15PM IN COURTROOM 10C RE: CLAIM OF EXEMPTION DTD 4/13/16 Catherine Brunson |
|
April 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED) SERVED ON REGIONS BANK (WRIT OF GARNISHMENT) ON 4/5/16 |
|
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
CLAIM FILED OF EXEMPTION AND REQUEST FOR HEARING |
|
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT TO DEFT F/B/ PLTF OF GARNISHMENT TO DEFT F/B/ PLTF |
|
February 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE PURSUANT TO FLA STAT 77.055 F/B PLT |
|
February 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF GARNISHEE AND DEMAND FOR GARNISHMENT FEE |
|
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT TO DFT (F/B PLT) | |
February 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED) SERVED ON WELLS FARGO BANK (WRIT OF GARNISHMENT) ON 2/5/16 |
|
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED GARNISHEE REGIONS BANK |
|
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED GARNISHEE WELLS FARGO BANK NA |
|
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
PAID $85.00 ON RECEIPT 1491849 $85.00 1491849 Fully Paid |
|
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
PAID $85.00 ON RECEIPT 1491918 $85.00 1491918 Fully Paid |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT FILED BY PLT |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR WRIT FOF GARNISHMENT FILED BY REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL FILED BY JERALYN ADELMAN |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL AS COUNSEL FOR PLT FILED BY ATTY DELMAN |
|
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM FROM JUDGE BRUNSON DTD 12/16/13 TO ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE CASE |
|
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event | REDISPOSED | |
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON LIZETRE MARIE BAEZ T. BARKDULL NOT SERVED |
|
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO: SERGIO BAEZ SERVED |
|
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF CONTEMPT. T BARKDULL |
|
October 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
LETTER FACT INFORMATION SHEET. |
|
October 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. 12/8/11 AT 8:45 AM |
|
October 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS GRANTED. T. BARKDULL |
|
September 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-UP Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
September 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING OCTOBER 12, 20N Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
May 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) NON SERVED OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON LIZETTE MARIE BAEZ |
|
February 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER/RULE TO SHOW CAUSE T BARDKULL III |
|
February 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
December 07, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING | |
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER ALLOWING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE (T BARKDULL) |
|
December 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO ALLOW TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
November 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
CHECK PRINTED A Disbursment of $100.00 on Check Number 22957 to JACOBSON SOBO & MOSELLE |
|
November 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER ALLOWING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE ON 11/19/09 @ 8:45 AM TBARKDULL |
|
November 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
MOTION ALLOW TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE - UP -11/05/09 Filed By ATTORNEY JUSTIN D JACOBSON |
|
October 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER EX PARTE DISSOLVING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT. CLERK TO PAY STATUTORY ATTYS FEE. (T.H.BARKDULL)-X- |
|
October 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
MOTION Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
September 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF GARNISHEE OF DIAGEO NORTH AMERICA INC BY LYNN DEMSHOCK |
|
September 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) BY SERVING DIAEGO LATIN AMERICAN & CARIBBEAN INC WITH A WRIT OF GARNISHMENT |
|
September 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) DIAEGO LATIN AMERICA & CARIBBEAN SERVED WITH WRIT OF GARNISHMENT |
|
July 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (T.H.BARKDULL) |
|
July 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED CERTIFIED COPY OF CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT TO GARNISHEE, DIAGEO LATIN AMERICA & CARRIBBEAN, INC.-HOLD BOX 57-- WGA-09-002120 |
|
July 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Registry Deposit of $103.00 was receipted on receipt CAMB323252. The registry fees due on this deposit are $3.00. Filed By |
|
July 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Registry Deposit Fee of $3.00 was receipted on receipt CAMB323253. Associated with Registry Deposit receipted on receipt CAMB323252. Filed By |
|
July 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
ISSUANCE OF WRITS - CA Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
July 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$85.00 was made on receipt CAMB323251. Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
July 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT. *UP 7/22/09 W/UNSIGNED ORDER* Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
July 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE INTERROGATORIES TO DFT BAEZ Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
July 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
July 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO SERGIO BEAZ Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
July 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE INTERROGATORIES TO DFT MILLER Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
July 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO MICHAEL EARL MILLER Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
July 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO MICHAEL EARL MILLER Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
July 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE INTERROGATORIES TO SERGIO BAEZ Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
July 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO POST JUDGMENT INTEREST AND PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF FINAL JUDGMENT |
|
July 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO SERGIO BAEZ Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
July 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
July 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING IN PART COMPLETION OF FACT INFO SHEET, SEE ORDER (T BARKDULL) |
|
July 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING PLTFS MOTION FOR PROCEEDINGS SUPPLEMENTARY (T BARKDULL) |
|
June 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER ALLOWING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE,7/8/09 DTD 6/11/09 T BARKDULL |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO ALLOW TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
May 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER ALLOWING PLTF TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY (T BARKDULL) |
|
May 12, 2009 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO ALLOW TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
May 12, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
April 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR CONTEMPT Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
April 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR PROCEEDINGS SUPPLEMENTARY TO EXECUTION, WITH ATTACHED AFFIDAVIT Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
April 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
REOPEN Associated to docket MOT filed on 2009-04-30 |
|
September 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED BY DEFAULT Associated to docket FJUD filed on 2008-09-22 |
|
September 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 022882 PAGE 00607 PLT SHALL RECOVER FROM DFTS *TBARKDULL* |
|
September 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED) 9/22/08 Filed by ATTORNEY MICHAEL L GRANT |
|
September 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 09-22-2008 @ 8:45 A.M. Filed by ATTORNEY MICHAEL L GRANT |
|
September 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 9/22/08 Filed by ATTORNEY MICHAEL L GRANT |
|
August 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (COPY ML'D) Filed by DEFENDANT MICHAEL EARL MILLER |
|
August 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (NON MILITARY) TO DFT LIZETTE MARIE BAEZ Filed by ATTORNEY MICHAEL L GRANT |
|
August 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DFT, MICHAEL EARL MILLER Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
August 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (NON MILITARY) AS TO DFT SERGIO BAEZ Filed by ATTORNEY MICHAEL L GRANT |
|
August 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (NON MILITARY) TO DFT, MICHAEL EARL MILLER Filed by ATTORNEY MICHAEL L GRANT |
|
July 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT AND SERGIO BAEZ AS TO THE AMEDED COMPLAINT COPY MLD Filed by DEFENDANT LIZETTE MARIE BAEZ |
|
July 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DFT LIZETTE MARIE BAEZ Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
July 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DFT SERGIO BAEZ Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
July 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) ALIAS SUMMONS SERVED 06-23-2008 Filed By DEFENDANT LIZETTE MARIE BEAZ |
|
July 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 06-23-2008 Filed By DEFENDANT SERGIO BEAZ |
|
May 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED ASM-08-002821 Filed By DEFENDANT LIZETTE MARIE BEAZ |
|
May 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED ASM-08-002820 Filed By DEFENDANT SERGIO BEAZ |
|
May 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON MO/FOR LEAVE TO FILE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. T BARKDULL |
|
April 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT & MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT WITH COPY OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT ATTACHED HERETO (SAME PARTIES)** Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
April 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON 5/6/08 |
|
March 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
AMENDED COMPLAINT Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
March 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT (AMENDED) ADDING DFTS SERGIO BEAZ AND LIZETTE MARIE BEAZ WITH ATTACHED EXHIBIT Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
March 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED MLD TO ATTY SM-08-043961 Filed By DEFENDANT LIZETTE MARIE BEAZ |
|
March 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED MLD TO ATTY SM-08-043960 Filed By DEFENDANT SERGIO BEAZ |
|
March 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SERVED 02-25-2008 Filed by DEFENDANT MICHAEL EARL MILLER |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-014707 Filed by DEFENDANT MICHAEL EARL MILLER |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event | ADDITIONAL COMMENTS | |
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event | PENDING | |
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$256.00 was made on receipt CAMB193722. Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
CAFF Filed by PLAINTIFF REGENT HOLDING CORPORATION |