Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank National Association As Trustee, The Bank Of New York Mellon, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Anthony Mannarino, Danielle Mannarino, Giuseppe Mannarino, Jane Doe, John Doe, (total of 9) See All represented by Scott F Saidel, Scott Jason Levine, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2008 |
CategoryReal Property/Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is filed by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE against various defendants. The complaint is divided into two counts.
In Count I, the plaintiff seeks to reestablish a promissory note under Section 673.3091 of the Fl...
RESPONSE TO:
Date: January 26, 2010ORDER
Date: April 10, 2014NOTICE
Date: April 30, 2013ORDER
Date: January 24, 2013STIPULATION
Date: October 14, 2010ORDER
Date: October 27, 2010ORDER
Date: October 27, 2010ORDER
Date: January 07, 2013ORDER
Date: November 20, 2012ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 12, 2012MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: December 20, 2012COMPLAINT
Date: January 24, 2008MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: March 31, 2008MOTION
Date: October 22, 2008ANSWER
Date: February 20, 2008MOTION/NOTICE JUDG DISMISSAL
Date: August 29, 2012COMPLAINT
Date: May 10, 2013FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 26726 PAGE 950
Date: April 10, 2014MOTION
Date: March 28, 2014NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: March 15, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
CHECK ISSUED Deposit (Led_ID: 556783 Case#: F.S. 116.21 JULY ADVERTISEMENT) Check #: 00005620 for $100 was disbursed. |
|
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
DISBURSEMENT REQUEST 1990481 $100.00 SHARON R BOCK CLERK & COMPTROLLER |
|
July 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL UNKNOWN TENANT(S |
|
July 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS |
|
June 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL UNKNOWN TENANT(S) |
|
June 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE BOOK 26853 PAGE 0579 ISSUED TO APPROVED PROPERTIES INC |
|
June 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL UNKNOWN TENANT(S |
|
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of $31,280.00 was made on receipt CAMB900424. Filed By |
|
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE FEES ADDED A Foreclosure Fees Payment of $13,830.70 was made on receipt CAMB900425. Filed By |
|
May 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$70.00 was made on receipt CAMB898233. Filed by PLAINTIFF THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.