Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Daniel J Shepherd, John Farina, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Richard S Cohen, against Mark Skeffington, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2008 |
CategoryLandlord/Tenant |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
This complaint is filed by Daniel J. Shepherd and John Farina, co-trustees, against Mark Skeffington for breach of lease. The plaintiffs were appointed as interim successor co-trustees for the land trusts by court order to replace the previous truste...
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 08, 2008COMPLAINT
Date: January 25, 2008REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: January 25, 2008REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: January 25, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 02, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
October 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED BY JUDGE Associated to docket FJUD filed on 2008-10-14 |
|
October 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 022910 PAGE 01661 (SUMMARY) PLT RECOVER FROM DFT *DFRENCH* |
|
September 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY COURT. Filed by PLAINTIFF DANIEL J SHEPHERD |
|
September 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON 10/7/08 @ 8:45 AM. Filed by ATTORNEY RICHARD S COHEN |
|
February 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT Filed by DEFENDANT MARK SKEFFINGTON |
|
February 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE |
|
February 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DFT MARK SKEFFINGTON Filed by PLAINTIFF DANIEL J SHEPHERD |
|
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBIT "B" TO PLTFS COMPLAINT Filed by PLAINTIFF DANIEL J SHEPHERD |
|
January 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) SVD 1/25/08 Filed by DEFENDANT MARK SKEFFINGTON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.